Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

School Buses

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0073 (SB0210)
Title
Intercounty Connector - Public School Bus - Exemption From Toll
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0365 /CH0262
Title
Public Schools - Bullying, Harassment, and Intimidation Policies - Update
Sponsor
Delegate Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0461 (SB0388)
Title
Crimes - Criminal Gangs - Prohibitions and Funding
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0681
Title
Vehicle Laws - School Vehicles - Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0750
Title
Public Schools - Electronic Smoking Devices - Policy and Disciplinary Standards
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0777
Title
Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in a Public Place - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1360 (SB0756)
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Breakfast Program - School Requirements (Breakfast After the Bell Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1473
Title
Public Schools - School Vehicles - Three-Point Seat Belts
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1486
Title
Workgroup on Transportation for Middle and High School Students in Prince George's County PG 440-16
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0083 /CH0529
Title
Public Safety - School Safety Enforcement Fund
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0210 (HB0073)
Title
Intercounty Connector - Public School Bus - Exemption From Toll
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0388 (HB0461)
Title
Crimes - Criminal Gangs - Prohibitions and Funding
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0520 /CH0397 (HB0756)
Title
County Boards of Education - School Buses - Motor Fuel Tax Exemption and Refund
Sponsor
Washington County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0756 (HB1360)
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Breakfast Program - School Requirements (Breakfast After the Bell Act)
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0073 (SB0210) Intercounty Connector - Public School Bus - Exemption From Toll Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/04/2016 - 2:00 PM
HB0365 /CH0262 Public Schools - Bullying, Harassment, and Intimidation Policies - Update Delegate Jackson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 262
Ways and Means
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0461 (SB0388) Crimes - Criminal Gangs - Prohibitions and Funding Speaker 3 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0681 Vehicle Laws - School Vehicles - Definition Delegate Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0750 Public Schools - Electronic Smoking Devices - Policy and Disciplinary Standards Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
Economic Matters
HB0777 Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in a Public Place - Prohibition Delegate Wilson, B. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1360 (SB0756) Primary and Secondary Education - Breakfast Program - School Requirements (Breakfast After the Bell Act) Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1473 Public Schools - School Vehicles - Three-Point Seat Belts Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1486 Workgroup on Transportation for Middle and High School Students in Prince George's County PG 440-16 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0083 /CH0529 Public Safety - School Safety Enforcement Fund Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 529
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0210 (HB0073) Intercounty Connector - Public School Bus - Exemption From Toll Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0388 (HB0461) Crimes - Criminal Gangs - Prohibitions and Funding President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0520 /CH0397 (HB0756) County Boards of Education - School Buses - Motor Fuel Tax Exemption and Refund Washington County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 397
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0756 (HB1360) Primary and Secondary Education - Breakfast Program - School Requirements (Breakfast After the Bell Act) Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Budget and Taxation
3/15/2016 - 2:30 PM
Ways and Means
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:48 PM