Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

School Buses

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0175 /CH0806
Title
Prince George’s County – Speed Monitoring Systems – Intersection of Old Fort Road and Maryland Route 210 (Indian Head Highway) PG 302–18
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0557
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Education Trust Fund - Use of Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1365
Title
Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring Systems - Operation in School Zones (Truth in Speed Cameras Act of 2018)
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1384
Title
Motor Vehicles - School Vehicles - Flashing Advisory Signs
Sponsor
Delegate Miele
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1605
Title
Task Force on Maryland Student Transportation Safety
Sponsor
Delegate Miele
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0175 /CH0806 Prince George’s County – Speed Monitoring Systems – Intersection of Old Fort Road and Maryland Route 210 (Indian Head Highway) PG 302–18 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 806
Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0557 Primary and Secondary Education - Education Trust Fund - Use of Fund Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Appropriations
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1365 Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring Systems - Operation in School Zones (Truth in Speed Cameras Act of 2018) Delegate Wivell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1384 Motor Vehicles - School Vehicles - Flashing Advisory Signs Delegate Miele 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB1605 Task Force on Maryland Student Transportation Safety Delegate Miele 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:54 PM