Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

School Buses

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0617 /CH0624 (SB0604/CH0625)
Title
Public and Nonpublic Schools - Medical Cannabis - Policy for Administration During School Hours and Events (Connor and Raina's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Johnson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0675 (SB0549)
Title
Education – Public Schools – Seizure Action Plans (Brynleigh Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1226
Title
Vehicle Laws - School Bus Safety - Occupant Capacity
Sponsor
Delegate Cain
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1234
Title
County Boards of Education - Student Transportation - Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1451
Title
School Bus Purchasing – Zero–Emission Vehicle – Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1481
Title
Zero-Emission Electric School Vehicles - Inspections
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1492
Title
Vehicle Laws - Bus Lane Monitoring Cameras - Authorization
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1526
Title
Transportation Carbon Reduction Fund – Establishment (Transportation Carbon Fund Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0549 (HB0675)
Title
Education - Public Schools - Seizure Action Plans (Brynleigh Act)
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0604 /CH0625 (HB0617/CH0624)
Title
Public and Nonpublic Schools – Medical Cannabis – Policy for Administration During School Hours and Events (Connor and Raina’s Law)
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0755
Title
Education - Harford County - Liability of School Bus Contractors
Sponsor
Harford County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0617 /CH0624 (SB0604/CH0625) Public and Nonpublic Schools - Medical Cannabis - Policy for Administration During School Hours and Events (Connor and Raina's Law) Delegate Johnson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 624
Health and Government Operations
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Finance
HB0675 (SB0549) Education – Public Schools – Seizure Action Plans (Brynleigh Act) Delegate Kerr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) and Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations)
Ways and Means
2/21/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB1226 Vehicle Laws - School Bus Safety - Occupant Capacity Delegate Cain 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1234 County Boards of Education - Student Transportation - Vehicles Delegate Adams 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1451 School Bus Purchasing – Zero–Emission Vehicle – Requirement Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
HB1481 Zero-Emission Electric School Vehicles - Inspections Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1492 Vehicle Laws - Bus Lane Monitoring Cameras - Authorization Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1526 Transportation Carbon Reduction Fund – Establishment (Transportation Carbon Fund Act) Delegate Korman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0549 (HB0675) Education - Public Schools - Seizure Action Plans (Brynleigh Act) Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0604 /CH0625 (HB0617/CH0624) Public and Nonpublic Schools – Medical Cannabis – Policy for Administration During School Hours and Events (Connor and Raina’s Law) Senator Feldman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 625
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Health and Government Operations
Ways and Means
SB0755 Education - Harford County - Liability of School Bus Contractors Harford County Senators 4 2 In the House - First Reading Ways and Means
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:35 PM