Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

School Testing

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0158
Title
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections - Standards and Requirements
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0284
Title
Education - Maryland High School Diploma - Civics Test Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Szeliga
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0347 (SB0275)
Title
Education - Community and Local Accountability for Struggling Schools (CLASS) Act of 2020 - Innovation Schools
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0348 (SB0267)
Title
AP Opportunities Act of 2020
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1300 (SB1000)
Title
Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Implementation
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1421
Title
Education - Advanced Courses - Automatic Enrollment
Sponsor
Delegate Cain
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1513 (SB0798)
Title
Education - Juvenile Services Education System - Establishment, Powers, and Duties
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1552 (SB0418)
Title
Education Savings Account Program - Established
Sponsor
Delegate Boteler
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0267 (HB0348)
Title
AP Opportunities Act of 2020
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0275 (HB0347)
Title
Education - Community and Local Accountability for Struggling Schools (CLASS) Act of 2020 - Innovation Schools
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0418 (HB1552)
Title
Education Savings Account Program - Established
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0798 (HB1513)
Title
Education - Juvenile Services Education System - Establishment, Powers, and Duties
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1000 (HB1300)
Title
Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Implementation
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0158 Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections - Standards and Requirements Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0284 Education - Maryland High School Diploma - Civics Test Requirement Delegate Szeliga 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/05/2020 - 2:00 PM
HB0347 (SB0275) Education - Community and Local Accountability for Struggling Schools (CLASS) Act of 2020 - Innovation Schools Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0348 (SB0267) AP Opportunities Act of 2020 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/05/2020 - 2:00 PM
HB1300 (SB1000) Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Implementation Speaker 6 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Appropriations
2/17/2020 - 12:00 PM
Ways and Means
2/17/2020 - 12:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Budget and Taxation
HB1421 Education - Advanced Courses - Automatic Enrollment Delegate Cain 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1513 (SB0798) Education - Juvenile Services Education System - Establishment, Powers, and Duties Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB1552 (SB0418) Education Savings Account Program - Established Delegate Boteler 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
SB0267 (HB0348) AP Opportunities Act of 2020 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0275 (HB0347) Education - Community and Local Accountability for Struggling Schools (CLASS) Act of 2020 - Innovation Schools President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0418 (HB1552) Education Savings Account Program - Established Senator Serafini 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Budget and Taxation
SB0798 (HB1513) Education - Juvenile Services Education System - Establishment, Powers, and Duties Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB1000 (HB1300) Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Implementation President 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 12:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2020 - 12:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/19/2020 1:14 PM