Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Search and Seizure

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0519
Title
Public Health - Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Safer Drug Consumption Facility Program
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0739 /CH0802 (SB0941/CH0803)
Title
Public Safety - SWAT Teams - Standards
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0917 (SB0878)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Cell Site Simulator Technology
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1256 (SB0982/CH0487)
Title
Department of Juvenile Services - Implementation of Task Force Recommendations - Report
Sponsor
Delegate Jalisi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1362 (SB0835)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Immigration - Community Trust
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1372
Title
Public Health - Ibogaine Treatment Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1407
Title
Criminal Procedure - Search Warrants - Full Names
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0068
Title
Criminal Law - Veterans - Medical Cannabis
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0835 (HB1362)
Title
Maryland Law Enforcement and Governmental Trust Act
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0878 (HB0917)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Cell Site Simulator Technology
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0941 /CH0803 (HB0739/CH0802)
Title
Public Safety - SWAT Teams - Standards
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0982 /CH0487 (HB1256)
Title
Department of Juvenile Services - Implementation of Task Force Recommendations - Report
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0519 Public Health - Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Safer Drug Consumption Facility Program Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0739 /CH0802 (SB0941/CH0803) Public Safety - SWAT Teams - Standards Delegate Moon 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 802
Judiciary
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0917 (SB0878) Criminal Procedure - Cell Site Simulator Technology Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1256 (SB0982/CH0487) Department of Juvenile Services - Implementation of Task Force Recommendations - Report Delegate Jalisi 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed (98-21)
Judiciary
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1362 (SB0835) Criminal Procedure - Immigration - Community Trust Delegate Morales 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1372 Public Health - Ibogaine Treatment Pilot Program Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1407 Criminal Procedure - Search Warrants - Full Names Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
SB0068 Criminal Law - Veterans - Medical Cannabis Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/25/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0835 (HB1362) Maryland Law Enforcement and Governmental Trust Act Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0878 (HB0917) Criminal Procedure - Cell Site Simulator Technology Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0941 /CH0803 (HB0739/CH0802) Public Safety - SWAT Teams - Standards Senator Smith 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 803
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0982 /CH0487 (HB1256) Department of Juvenile Services - Implementation of Task Force Recommendations - Report Senator Muse 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 487
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:50 PM