Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Security Alarms

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0645 /CH0205 (SB0662/CH0206)
Title
Business Regulation – Wireless Security Systems – Local Government Licenses and Permits
Sponsor
Delegate Branch
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1117 /CH0477 (SB0927/CH0478)
Title
Alarm Systems - Registration and Renewal - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Branch
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1446
Title
Public Schools - School Emergency Response Systems - Study (Safer Schools Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Long
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0662 /CH0206 (HB0645/CH0205)
Title
Business Regulation – Wireless Security Systems – Local Government Licenses and Permits
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0728 /CH0484 (HB0810)
Title
Public Safety - Battery Operated Smoke Alarms
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0927 /CH0478 (HB1117/CH0477)
Title
Alarm Systems - Registration and Renewal - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0645 /CH0205 (SB0662/CH0206) Business Regulation – Wireless Security Systems – Local Government Licenses and Permits Delegate Branch 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 205
Economic Matters
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1117 /CH0477 (SB0927/CH0478) Alarm Systems - Registration and Renewal - Penalties Delegate Branch 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 477
Economic Matters
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1446 Public Schools - School Emergency Response Systems - Study (Safer Schools Act) Delegate Long 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/09/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0662 /CH0206 (HB0645/CH0205) Business Regulation – Wireless Security Systems – Local Government Licenses and Permits Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 206
Finance
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0728 /CH0484 (HB0810) Public Safety - Battery Operated Smoke Alarms Senator King 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 484
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0927 /CH0478 (HB1117/CH0477) Alarm Systems - Registration and Renewal - Penalties Senator Benson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 478
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:55 PM