Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Security Deposits

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0249 /CH0489 (SB0345/CH0488)
Title
Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security Deposits
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0683
Title
Real Property - Residential and Mobile Home Park Leases - Interest on Security Deposits
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0345 /CH0488 (HB0249/CH0489)
Title
Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security Deposits
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0450
Title
Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security Deposits
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0249 /CH0489 (SB0345/CH0488) Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security Deposits Delegate McMillan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 489
Environmental Matters
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0683 Real Property - Residential and Mobile Home Park Leases - Interest on Security Deposits Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0345 /CH0488 (HB0249/CH0489) Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security Deposits Senator Muse 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 488
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0450 Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security Deposits Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM