Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Security Deposits

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0782 /CH0455 (SB0408)
Title
Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security Deposits
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0893
Title
Electric Companies - Customers - Security Deposits
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1082 (SB0745)
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Security Deposit - Use for Unpaid Water and Sewer Bills
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1182 /CH0471 (SB0821)
Title
Academic Facilities Bonding Authority
Sponsor
Chair, Appropriations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0408 (HB0782/CH0455)
Title
Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security Deposits
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0649 (HB1183/CH0472)
Title
Real Property - Contract for Sale of New Home
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0745 (HB1082)
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Security Deposit - Use for Unpaid Water and Sewer Bills
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0782 /CH0455 (SB0408) Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security Deposits Delegate McMillan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 455
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0893 Electric Companies - Customers - Security Deposits Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1082 (SB0745) Landlord and Tenant - Security Deposit - Use for Unpaid Water and Sewer Bills Delegate McKay 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB1182 /CH0471 (SB0821) Academic Facilities Bonding Authority Chair, Appropriations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 471
Appropriations
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0408 (HB0782/CH0455) Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security Deposits Senator Muse 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0649 (HB1183/CH0472) Real Property - Contract for Sale of New Home Senator Muse 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/08/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0745 (HB1082) Landlord and Tenant - Security Deposit - Use for Unpaid Water and Sewer Bills Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM