Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Security Deposits

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1059 /CH0643
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Security Deposit - Contents of Lease
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1060
Title
Model Residential Leases - Required Contents
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0241 /CH0543
Title
Real Property - Senior Apartment Facilities - Conversion
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0463
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Expedited Eviction Proceedings - Notice and Appeals
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1059 /CH0643 Landlord and Tenant - Security Deposit - Contents of Lease Delegate Morales 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 643
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1060 Model Residential Leases - Required Contents Delegate Morales 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0241 /CH0543 Real Property - Senior Apartment Facilities - Conversion Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 543
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0463 Landlord and Tenant - Expedited Eviction Proceedings - Notice and Appeals Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:48 PM