Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Security Interests -see also- Liens; Mechanics' Liens

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0099 (SB0404/CH0058)
Title
Maryland Uniform Commercial Code - Secured Transactions - Notice of Filing of Financing Statement
Sponsor
Delegate Arora
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0274 /CH0592 (SB0708)
Title
Residential Property - Statute of Limitations for Certain Specialties and Motion for Certain Deficiency Judgments
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0595 /CH0233
Title
Real Property - Foreclosure of Residential Property - Certified Community Development Financial Institutions
Sponsor
Delegate Niemann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1370
Title
Commercial Law - Financing Statements - Refusal of Filing Office to Accept
Sponsor
Delegate Arora
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1435
Title
Commercial Law - Financing Statements - Correction of Records
Sponsor
Delegate Arora
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1527
Title
Real Property - Bankruptcy Proceedings - Expedited Foreclosure Timeline
Sponsor
Delegate Braveboy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0377
Title
Procurement - Security Requirements - Extension of Sunset Provision
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0404 /CH0058 (HB0099)
Title
Maryland Uniform Commercial Code - Secured Transactions - Notice of Filing of Financing Statement
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0708 (HB0274/CH0592)
Title
Residential Property - Statute of Limitations for Certain Specialties and Motion for Certain Deficiency Judgments
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0099 (SB0404/CH0058) Maryland Uniform Commercial Code - Secured Transactions - Notice of Filing of Financing Statement Delegate Arora 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
1/29/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0274 /CH0592 (SB0708) Residential Property - Statute of Limitations for Certain Specialties and Motion for Certain Deficiency Judgments Delegate Lafferty 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 592
Environmental Matters
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0595 /CH0233 Real Property - Foreclosure of Residential Property - Certified Community Development Financial Institutions Delegate Niemann 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 233
Environmental Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1370 Commercial Law - Financing Statements - Refusal of Filing Office to Accept Delegate Arora 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1435 Commercial Law - Financing Statements - Correction of Records Delegate Arora 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
HB1527 Real Property - Bankruptcy Proceedings - Expedited Foreclosure Timeline Delegate Braveboy 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0377 Procurement - Security Requirements - Extension of Sunset Provision Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0404 /CH0058 (HB0099) Maryland Uniform Commercial Code - Secured Transactions - Notice of Filing of Financing Statement Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 58
Finance
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0708 (HB0274/CH0592) Residential Property - Statute of Limitations for Certain Specialties and Motion for Certain Deficiency Judgments Senator Raskin 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM