Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Securities

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0583 /CH0071
Title
Economic Development - Equity Participation Investment Program - Small Businesses
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0916 /CH0551 (SB0713/CH0550)
Title
Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Miscellaneous Provisions
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1243 /CH0558 (SB0811/CH0557)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Maryland Securities Act - Registration and Filing Exemptions
Sponsor
Delegate Hucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1303 (SB0751)
Title
Health Occupations - Pre-Need Contracts - Trust Accounts
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1319
Title
Real Property - Foreclosures - Deficiency Judgments Prohibited and Definition of "Secured Party" (Foreclosure Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Mizeur
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1365
Title
Corporations and Associations - Securities - Maryland Small Business Funding Act
Sponsor
Delegate Schuh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0008 (SJ0008)
Title
Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking Functions
Sponsor
Delegate Braveboy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0661 /CH0070
Title
Economic Development - Equity Participation Investment Program - Small Businesses
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0713 /CH0550 (HB0916/CH0551)
Title
Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Miscellaneous Provisions
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0751 (HB1303)
Title
Health Occupations - Pre-Need Contracts - Trust Accounts
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0811 /CH0557 (HB1243/CH0558)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Maryland Securities Act - Registration and Filing Exemptions
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0008 (HJ0008)
Title
Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking Functions
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0583 /CH0071 Economic Development - Equity Participation Investment Program - Small Businesses Delegate Davis 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 71
Economic Matters
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0916 /CH0551 (SB0713/CH0550) Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Miscellaneous Provisions Delegate Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 551
Economic Matters
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1243 /CH0558 (SB0811/CH0557) Corporations and Associations - Maryland Securities Act - Registration and Filing Exemptions Delegate Hucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 558
Economic Matters
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1303 (SB0751) Health Occupations - Pre-Need Contracts - Trust Accounts Delegate Davis 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1319 Real Property - Foreclosures - Deficiency Judgments Prohibited and Definition of "Secured Party" (Foreclosure Protection Act) Delegate Mizeur 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1365 Corporations and Associations - Securities - Maryland Small Business Funding Act Delegate Schuh 2 2 In the House - Hearing cancelled
Rules and Executive Nominations
HJ0008 (SJ0008) Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking Functions Delegate Braveboy 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0661 /CH0070 Economic Development - Equity Participation Investment Program - Small Businesses Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 70
Finance
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0713 /CH0550 (HB0916/CH0551) Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Miscellaneous Provisions Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 550
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0751 (HB1303) Health Occupations - Pre-Need Contracts - Trust Accounts Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0811 /CH0557 (HB1243/CH0558) Corporations and Associations - Maryland Securities Act - Registration and Filing Exemptions Senator Raskin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 557
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SJ0008 (HJ0008) Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking Functions Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM