Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Securities

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0613
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Employee-Owned Businesses
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0873 (SB0659/CH0720)
Title
Corporations – Transfer of Assets and Exchange of Shares of Stock
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0876 (SB0498)
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Employee-Owned Businesses
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1506 /CH0794
Title
Office of the Attorney General - Securities Commissioner - Asset Recovery for Exploited Seniors
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1634 /CH0731 (SB1068/CH0732)
Title
Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0498 (HB0876)
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Employee-Owned Businesses
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0778
Title
Procurement - Payment Security - Construction Contracts
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0953
Title
Recordation Tax – Collection by State Department of Assessments and Taxation – Distribution
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1068 /CH0732 (HB1634/CH0731)
Title
Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0613 Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Employee-Owned Businesses Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB0873 (SB0659/CH0720) Corporations – Transfer of Assets and Exchange of Shares of Stock Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Economic Matters
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0876 (SB0498) Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Employee-Owned Businesses Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1506 /CH0794 Office of the Attorney General - Securities Commissioner - Asset Recovery for Exploited Seniors Delegate Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 794
Economic Matters
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1634 /CH0731 (SB1068/CH0732) Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018 Delegate Frick 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 731
Economic Matters
2/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0498 (HB0876) Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Employee-Owned Businesses Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0778 Procurement - Payment Security - Construction Contracts Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0953 Recordation Tax – Collection by State Department of Assessments and Taxation – Distribution Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2018 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1068 /CH0732 (HB1634/CH0731) Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018 Senator Rosapepe 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 732
Finance
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:55 PM