Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Self Defense

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0252
Title
Protection of Persons and Property - Criminal Immunity
Sponsor
Delegate Cluster
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0375 (SB0184)
Title
Public Safety - Permit to Carry, Wear, or Transport a Handgun - Qualifications
Sponsor
Delegate Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0769 (SB0214)
Title
Public Safety - Handgun Permit - Temporary Training Waiver
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1107
Title
Baltimore City - Police Officers - Warrantless Arrests
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0184 (HB0375)
Title
Public Safety - Permit to Carry, Wear, or Transport a Handgun - Qualifications
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0214 (HB0769)
Title
Public Safety - Handgun Permit - Temporary Training Waiver
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0264
Title
Service Animals - Aggravated Cruelty and False Representation
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0528 (HB0250)
Title
General Provisions - Open Meetings Act - Required Training and Certificate of Compliance
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0252 Protection of Persons and Property - Criminal Immunity Delegate Cluster 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0375 (SB0184) Public Safety - Permit to Carry, Wear, or Transport a Handgun - Qualifications Delegate Reilly 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0769 (SB0214) Public Safety - Handgun Permit - Temporary Training Waiver Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1107 Baltimore City - Police Officers - Warrantless Arrests Delegate Anderson 4 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (32-13)
Judiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0184 (HB0375) Public Safety - Permit to Carry, Wear, or Transport a Handgun - Qualifications Senator Norman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0214 (HB0769) Public Safety - Handgun Permit - Temporary Training Waiver Senator Norman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0264 Service Animals - Aggravated Cruelty and False Representation Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0528 (HB0250) General Provisions - Open Meetings Act - Required Training and Certificate of Compliance Senator Bates 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:48 PM