Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Self Defense

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0608 (SB1011)
Title
Criminal Law - Crimes Against Property - Right to Defend Property
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0663 (SB0511)
Title
Public Safety - Permit to Carry, Wear, or Transport a Handgun - Qualifications
Sponsor
Delegate Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0245
Title
Public Safety - Permit to Carry, Wear, or Transport a Handgun - Qualifications
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0444
Title
Service Animals - Aggravated Cruelty and False Representation
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0511 (HB0663)
Title
Public Safety - Permit to Carry, Wear, or Transport a Handgun - Qualifications
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1011 (HB0608)
Title
Criminal Law - Crimes Against Property - Right to Defend Property
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0608 (SB1011) Criminal Law - Crimes Against Property - Right to Defend Property Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0663 (SB0511) Public Safety - Permit to Carry, Wear, or Transport a Handgun - Qualifications Delegate Reilly 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0245 Public Safety - Permit to Carry, Wear, or Transport a Handgun - Qualifications Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0444 Service Animals - Aggravated Cruelty and False Representation Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0511 (HB0663) Public Safety - Permit to Carry, Wear, or Transport a Handgun - Qualifications Senator Norman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1011 (HB0608) Criminal Law - Crimes Against Property - Right to Defend Property Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:50 PM