Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Self Defense

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0647
Title
Public Safety - Permit to Carry, Wear, or Transport a Handgun - Qualifications
Sponsor
Delegate Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1309
Title
Criminal Law - Crimes Against Property - Right to Defend Property
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0099
Title
Public Safety - Permit to Carry, Wear, or Transport a Handgun - Qualifications
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0814
Title
Public Safety - Permit to Carry, Wear, or Transport a Handgun - Qualifications
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0907
Title
Public Safety - Firearms Database
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0647 Public Safety - Permit to Carry, Wear, or Transport a Handgun - Qualifications Delegate Reilly 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1309 Criminal Law - Crimes Against Property - Right to Defend Property Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0099 Public Safety - Permit to Carry, Wear, or Transport a Handgun - Qualifications Senator Norman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0814 Public Safety - Permit to Carry, Wear, or Transport a Handgun - Qualifications Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0907 Public Safety - Firearms Database Senator Waugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:55 PM