Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Service Stations

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0188
Title
Retail Service Stations - Disaster Preparation - Generator Tax Credit
Sponsor
Delegate McDermott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0817
Title
Property Tax Credit - Retail Service Stations - Alternate Power Sources
Sponsor
Delegate Murphy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0835 (SB0948)
Title
Environment - Retail Service Stations - Setback Certification
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0962
Title
Motor Fuel Taxes - Consumer Disclosure Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1436 (SB0967)
Title
Business Regulation - Retail Service Stations - Video Cameras Required
Sponsor
Delegate Swain
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0652
Title
Motor Fuel - Mass Transit Tax - Transit Funding
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0689
Title
Property Tax Credit - Retail Service Stations - Alternate Power Sources
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0948 (HB0835)
Title
Environment - Retail Service Stations - Setback Certification
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0967 (HB1436)
Title
Business Regulation - Retail Service Stations - Video Cameras Required
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0188 Retail Service Stations - Disaster Preparation - Generator Tax Credit Delegate McDermott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0817 Property Tax Credit - Retail Service Stations - Alternate Power Sources Delegate Murphy 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0835 (SB0948) Environment - Retail Service Stations - Setback Certification Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0962 Motor Fuel Taxes - Consumer Disclosure Requirements Delegate Bates 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1436 (SB0967) Business Regulation - Retail Service Stations - Video Cameras Required Delegate Swain 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Economic Matters
SB0652 Motor Fuel - Mass Transit Tax - Transit Funding Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 PM
SB0689 Property Tax Credit - Retail Service Stations - Alternate Power Sources Senator Montgomery 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0948 (HB0835) Environment - Retail Service Stations - Setback Certification Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0967 (HB1436) Business Regulation - Retail Service Stations - Video Cameras Required Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM