Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Service Stations

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0187
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Payment of Wages
Sponsor
Delegate Braveboy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0295 /CH0262 (SB0331)
Title
Maryland Minimum Wage Act of 2014
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0574 (SB0487)
Title
Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Replacement Parts for Damaged Motor Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate Olszewski
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1196 (SB0065)
Title
Business Regulation - Retail Service Stations - Video Cameras Required
Sponsor
Delegate Swain
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1311
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Aftermarket Parts - Warranty Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Impallaria
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1345 /CH0360 (SB0908/CH0359)
Title
Electric Vehicles and Recharging Equipment - Rebates and Tax Credits
Sponsor
Delegate McHale
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1383
Title
Environment - Retail Service Stations - Setback Certification
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0065 (HB1196)
Title
Business Regulation - Retail Service Stations - Video Cameras Required
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0331 (HB0295/CH0262)
Title
Maryland Minimum Wage Act of 2014
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0487 (HB0574)
Title
Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Replacement Parts for Damaged Motor Vehicles
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0631
Title
Environment - Retail Service Stations - Setback Certification
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0788
Title
Income Tax Credit - Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment - Retail Service Station Dealers
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0908 /CH0359 (HB1345/CH0360)
Title
Electric Vehicles and Recharging Equipment - Rebates and Tax Credits
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0187 Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Payment of Wages Delegate Braveboy 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0295 /CH0262 (SB0331) Maryland Minimum Wage Act of 2014 Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 262
Economic Matters
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0574 (SB0487) Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Replacement Parts for Damaged Motor Vehicles Delegate Olszewski 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1196 (SB0065) Business Regulation - Retail Service Stations - Video Cameras Required Delegate Swain 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1311 Motor Vehicle Insurance - Aftermarket Parts - Warranty Requirements Delegate Impallaria 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1345 /CH0360 (SB0908/CH0359) Electric Vehicles and Recharging Equipment - Rebates and Tax Credits Delegate McHale 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 360
Environmental Matters
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1383 Environment - Retail Service Stations - Setback Certification Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0065 (HB1196) Business Regulation - Retail Service Stations - Video Cameras Required Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
1/23/2014 - 2:00 PM
SB0331 (HB0295/CH0262) Maryland Minimum Wage Act of 2014 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 12:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
2/17/2014 - 12:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0487 (HB0574) Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Replacement Parts for Damaged Motor Vehicles Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0631 Environment - Retail Service Stations - Setback Certification Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0788 Income Tax Credit - Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment - Retail Service Station Dealers Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0908 /CH0359 (HB1345/CH0360) Electric Vehicles and Recharging Equipment - Rebates and Tax Credits Senator Manno 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 359
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Environmental Matters
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM