Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Service Stations

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0342 /CH0060 (SB0277/CH0059)
Title
Motor Fuel Suppliers and Retail Service Station Dealers - Promotion - Sales
Sponsor
Delegate Carey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0584
Title
Economic Development - One Maryland Tax Credit - Expansion
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0931
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Warehouse Shopping Clubs - Beer or Wine Licenses
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1258
Title
Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Replacement Parts for Damaged Motor Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate Impallaria
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1290
Title
Motor Fuel Dispensing Equipment - Tax Rate Information
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0277 /CH0059 (HB0342/CH0060)
Title
Motor Fuel Suppliers and Retail Service Station Dealers - Promotion - Sales
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0528 (HB0250)
Title
General Provisions - Open Meetings Act - Required Training and Certificate of Compliance
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1127
Title
Business Regulation - Retail Service Station Dealers - Required Signs
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0342 /CH0060 (SB0277/CH0059) Motor Fuel Suppliers and Retail Service Station Dealers - Promotion - Sales Delegate Carey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 60
Economic Matters
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0584 Economic Development - One Maryland Tax Credit - Expansion Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0931 Alcoholic Beverages - Warehouse Shopping Clubs - Beer or Wine Licenses Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1258 Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Replacement Parts for Damaged Motor Vehicles Delegate Impallaria 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1290 Motor Fuel Dispensing Equipment - Tax Rate Information Delegate Adams 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/14/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2016 - 1:30 PM
SB0277 /CH0059 (HB0342/CH0060) Motor Fuel Suppliers and Retail Service Station Dealers - Promotion - Sales Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 59
Finance
2/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0528 (HB0250) General Provisions - Open Meetings Act - Required Training and Certificate of Compliance Senator Bates 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1127 Business Regulation - Retail Service Station Dealers - Required Signs Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:48 PM