Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Shore Erosion

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0567 (SB0115)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Cape St. Claire Beach Replenishment
Sponsor
Delegate Saab
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0779 (SB0719)
Title
Conserving Working Waterfront Farms Act of 2017
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0108 /CH0228
Title
Property Tax Credit - Erosion Control Measures - Nonstructural and Structural Shoreline Stabilization
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0115 (HB0567)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Cape St. Claire Beach Replenishment
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0719 (HB0779)
Title
Conserving Working Waterfront Farms Act of 2017
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0567 (SB0115) Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Cape St. Claire Beach Replenishment Delegate Saab 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/11/2017 - 9:00 AM
HB0779 (SB0719) Conserving Working Waterfront Farms Act of 2017 Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0108 /CH0228 Property Tax Credit - Erosion Control Measures - Nonstructural and Structural Shoreline Stabilization Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 228
Budget and Taxation
2/01/2017 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0115 (HB0567) Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Cape St. Claire Beach Replenishment Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 11:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 11:00 AM
SB0719 (HB0779) Conserving Working Waterfront Farms Act of 2017 Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:51 PM
Click to return on the top page