Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Sidewalks

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0118 (SB0202)
Title
State Highway Administration - Highway Work Permittees - Notice of Sidewalk Closure
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0777
Title
Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in a Public Place - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1304 (SB1036)
Title
Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in Public - Penalty
Sponsor
Delegate Jalisi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1580
Title
Marijuana CONTRol (Cannabis Oversight and Nondiscrimination through Taxation, Regulation, and Legalization) Act of 2016
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0202 (HB0118)
Title
State Highway Administration - Highway Work Permittees - Notice of Sidewalk Closure
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1036 (HB1304)
Title
Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in Public - Penalty
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0118 (SB0202) State Highway Administration - Highway Work Permittees - Notice of Sidewalk Closure Delegate Korman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/04/2016 - 2:00 PM
HB0777 Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in a Public Place - Prohibition Delegate Wilson, B. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1304 (SB1036) Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in Public - Penalty Delegate Jalisi 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1580 Marijuana CONTRol (Cannabis Oversight and Nondiscrimination through Taxation, Regulation, and Legalization) Act of 2016 Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0202 (HB0118) State Highway Administration - Highway Work Permittees - Notice of Sidewalk Closure Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
SB1036 (HB1304) Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in Public - Penalty Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:49 PM