Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Signs and Billboards

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0286 /CH0083
Title
Calvert and St. Mary's Counties - Scenic Byways - Signs
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0385 (SB0040)
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0751
Title
Health - Food Allergy Awareness
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0760 (SB0557)
Title
Food Fish and Shellfish - Labeling and Identification Requirements (Maryland Seafood Authenticity Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0764 (SB0307)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Blair Regional Park Scoreboards
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0897
Title
Public Health - Synthetic Infill Turf Fields - Informational Signs
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1153
Title
State Highway Administration - Signs Along State Highways - Public Libraries
Sponsor
Delegate Proctor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0040 (HB0385)
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0086 /CH0323
Title
Public Safety - Hit and Run Suspects - Yellow Alert Program
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0307 (HB0764)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Blair Regional Park Scoreboards
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0557 (HB0760)
Title
Food Fish and Shellfish - Labeling and Identification Requirements (Maryland Seafood Authenticity Act)
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0286 /CH0083 Calvert and St. Mary's Counties - Scenic Byways - Signs Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 83
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0385 (SB0040) Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act Delegate Clippinger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 12:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/13/2015 - 12:30 PM
HB0751 Health - Food Allergy Awareness Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB0760 (SB0557) Food Fish and Shellfish - Labeling and Identification Requirements (Maryland Seafood Authenticity Act) Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0764 (SB0307) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Blair Regional Park Scoreboards Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/14/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0897 Public Health - Synthetic Infill Turf Fields - Informational Signs Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1153 State Highway Administration - Signs Along State Highways - Public Libraries Delegate Proctor 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0040 (HB0385) Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0086 /CH0323 Public Safety - Hit and Run Suspects - Yellow Alert Program Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 323
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2015 - 2:00 PM
Judiciary
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0307 (HB0764) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Blair Regional Park Scoreboards Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 10:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/14/2015 - 10:00 AM
SB0557 (HB0760) Food Fish and Shellfish - Labeling and Identification Requirements (Maryland Seafood Authenticity Act) Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM