Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Small Business

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0050
Title
Minority Business Enterprise Certification - Cap on Personal Net Worth
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0102 /CH0425 (SB0127)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0226 /CH0003 (SB0275)
Title
Maryland Offshore Wind Energy Act of 2013
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0356 /CH0105
Title
Military Personnel and Veteran-Owned Small Business No-Interest Loan Program
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0361 /CH0368
Title
Health Insurance - Conformity with and Implementation of Federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0386 /CH0109 (SB0203)
Title
Income Tax Credit - Qualified Research and Development Expenses - Credit Amounts and Small Business Refund
Sponsor
Delegate Barve
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0564 (SB0498)
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification and Credit - Creation of a Qualifying Business Enterprise
Sponsor
Delegate Branch
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0681
Title
Invest Maryland Program - Alteration of Program Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0803 /CH0390
Title
Income Tax - Business and Economic Development - Cybersecurity Investment Incentive Tax Credit
Sponsor
Chair, Ways and Means Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1158
Title
Corporate Income Tax - Main Street Employer Tax Rebate
Sponsor
Delegate Mizeur
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1173
Title
Small Business Energy Assistance Act
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1331
Title
Labor and Employment - Parental Leave - Birth or Adoption of a Child
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1452
Title
Linked Deposit Program for Small Businesses
Sponsor
Delegate Vaughn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0070 /CH0175
Title
Business and Economic Development - Enterprise Fund and Invest Maryland Program
Sponsor
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0127 (HB0102/CH0425)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0203 (HB0386/CH0109)
Title
Income Tax Credit - Qualified Research and Development Expenses - Credit Amounts and Small Business Refund
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0275 (HB0226/CH0003)
Title
Maryland Offshore Wind Energy Act of 2013
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0482 /CH0482
Title
Income Tax Credit - Security Clearances - Employer Costs
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0498 (HB0564)
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification and Credit - Creation of a Qualifying Business Enterprise
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1072 /CH0345
Title
Linked Deposit Programs for Small Businesses and Minority Business Enterprises
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0050 Minority Business Enterprise Certification - Cap on Personal Net Worth Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB0102 /CH0425 (SB0127) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013 Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 425
Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0226 /CH0003 (SB0275) Maryland Offshore Wind Energy Act of 2013 Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 3
Economic Matters
2/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0356 /CH0105 Military Personnel and Veteran-Owned Small Business No-Interest Loan Program Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 105
Economic Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0361 /CH0368 Health Insurance - Conformity with and Implementation of Federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 368
Health and Government Operations
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0386 /CH0109 (SB0203) Income Tax Credit - Qualified Research and Development Expenses - Credit Amounts and Small Business Refund Delegate Barve 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 109
Ways and Means
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0564 (SB0498) Income Tax - Subtraction Modification and Credit - Creation of a Qualifying Business Enterprise Delegate Branch 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
Economic Matters
HB0681 Invest Maryland Program - Alteration of Program Requirements Delegate Fisher 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0803 /CH0390 Income Tax - Business and Economic Development - Cybersecurity Investment Incentive Tax Credit Chair, Ways and Means Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 390
Ways and Means
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/02/2013 - 1:30 PM
HB1158 Corporate Income Tax - Main Street Employer Tax Rebate Delegate Mizeur 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/08/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1173 Small Business Energy Assistance Act Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Economic Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB1331 Labor and Employment - Parental Leave - Birth or Adoption of a Child Delegate Kelly, A. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1452 Linked Deposit Program for Small Businesses Delegate Vaughn 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Economic Matters
SB0070 /CH0175 Business and Economic Development - Enterprise Fund and Invest Maryland Program Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 175
Budget and Taxation
1/30/2013 - 3:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0127 (HB0102/CH0425) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0203 (HB0386/CH0109) Income Tax Credit - Qualified Research and Development Expenses - Credit Amounts and Small Business Refund Senator King 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Ways and Means
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0275 (HB0226/CH0003) Maryland Offshore Wind Energy Act of 2013 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0482 /CH0482 Income Tax Credit - Security Clearances - Employer Costs Senator Manno 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 482
Budget and Taxation
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/08/2013 - 11:30 AM
SB0498 (HB0564) Income Tax - Subtraction Modification and Credit - Creation of a Qualifying Business Enterprise Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Budget and Taxation
SB1072 /CH0345 Linked Deposit Programs for Small Businesses and Minority Business Enterprises Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 345
Finance
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/06/2013 - 10:30 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM