Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Small Business

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0014
Title
Small Business Reserve Program - Procurements by Designated Procurement Units
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0169
Title
Health Insurance - Rollback of Federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act Conforming Provisions
Sponsor
Delegate Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0451 /CH0228
Title
Neighborhood Business Development Program - Financial Assistance for Food Deserts
Sponsor
Chair, Environmental Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0468
Title
Maryland Economic Development Assistance Fund - Training and Technology Projects
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0473 (SB0787)
Title
Economic Development - Green Business Incentive Zones
Sponsor
Delegate Summers
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0487 (SB0975/CH0076)
Title
Small Business Reserve Program - Definition of Small Business - Repeal of Sunset Provision
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0583 /CH0071
Title
Economic Development - Equity Participation Investment Program - Small Businesses
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0693 /CH0610 (SB0504)
Title
Health Insurance - Essential Health Benefits - Pediatric Dental Benefits
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0738 (SB0493)
Title
Economic Development - Commission on Maryland's Future
Sponsor
Delegate Branch
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0887
Title
Corporate Income Tax - Main Street Employer Tax Rebate
Sponsor
Delegate Mizeur
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1018
Title
Task Force to Study the Impact of Unemployment Insurance Contribution Fluctuations on Small Businesses
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1169
Title
Income Tax Credit - Unemployed Veterans - Start-Up Business
Sponsor
Delegate Turner
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1229
Title
Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Repeal - Transfer of Enrollees to Federal Health Insurance Marketplace
Sponsor
Delegate Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1317 /CH0652
Title
Higher Education - Maryland Technology Internship Program
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1447 (SB0934)
Title
State Aid Reporting Requirement - Nonprofit Entities - Minority Business Participation
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0096 /CH0023
Title
Health Insurance - Conformity With and Implementation of the Federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0493 (HB0738)
Title
Economic Development - Commission on Maryland's Future
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0504 (HB0693/CH0610)
Title
Health Insurance - Essential Health Benefits - Pediatric Dental Benefits
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0661 /CH0070
Title
Economic Development - Equity Participation Investment Program - Small Businesses
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0787 (HB0473)
Title
Economic Development - Green Business Incentive Zones
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0934 (HB1447)
Title
State Aid Reporting Requirement - Nonprofit Entities - Minority Business Participation
Sponsor
Senator Jones-Rodwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0975 /CH0076 (HB0487)
Title
Small Business Reserve Program - Definition of Small Business - Repeal of Sunset Provision
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0014 Small Business Reserve Program - Procurements by Designated Procurement Units Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0169 Health Insurance - Rollback of Federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act Conforming Provisions Delegate Hough 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2014 - 12:30 PM
HB0451 /CH0228 Neighborhood Business Development Program - Financial Assistance for Food Deserts Chair, Environmental Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 228
Environmental Matters
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0468 Maryland Economic Development Assistance Fund - Training and Technology Projects Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0473 (SB0787) Economic Development - Green Business Incentive Zones Delegate Summers 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB0487 (SB0975/CH0076) Small Business Reserve Program - Definition of Small Business - Repeal of Sunset Provision Delegate Reznik 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Health and Government Operations
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0583 /CH0071 Economic Development - Equity Participation Investment Program - Small Businesses Delegate Davis 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 71
Economic Matters
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0693 /CH0610 (SB0504) Health Insurance - Essential Health Benefits - Pediatric Dental Benefits Delegate Bromwell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 610
Health and Government Operations
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0738 (SB0493) Economic Development - Commission on Maryland's Future Delegate Branch 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0887 Corporate Income Tax - Main Street Employer Tax Rebate Delegate Mizeur 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1018 Task Force to Study the Impact of Unemployment Insurance Contribution Fluctuations on Small Businesses Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1169 Income Tax Credit - Unemployed Veterans - Start-Up Business Delegate Turner 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1229 Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Repeal - Transfer of Enrollees to Federal Health Insurance Marketplace Delegate Hough 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2014 - 12:30 PM
HB1317 /CH0652 Higher Education - Maryland Technology Internship Program Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 652
Appropriations
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1447 (SB0934) State Aid Reporting Requirement - Nonprofit Entities - Minority Business Participation Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0096 /CH0023 Health Insurance - Conformity With and Implementation of the Federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 23
Finance
1/15/2014 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0493 (HB0738) Economic Development - Commission on Maryland's Future Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0504 (HB0693/CH0610) Health Insurance - Essential Health Benefits - Pediatric Dental Benefits Senator Kelley 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0661 /CH0070 Economic Development - Equity Participation Investment Program - Small Businesses Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 70
Finance
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0787 (HB0473) Economic Development - Green Business Incentive Zones Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0934 (HB1447) State Aid Reporting Requirement - Nonprofit Entities - Minority Business Participation Senator Jones-Rodwell 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing cancelled
Budget and Taxation
SB0975 /CH0076 (HB0487) Small Business Reserve Program - Definition of Small Business - Repeal of Sunset Provision Senator Montgomery 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 76
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM