Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Social Security

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0224 /CH0158 (SB0279/CH0157)
Title
Election Law - Improving Access to Voting
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0333 /CH0367
Title
Family Investment Program - Couples Advancing Together Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0505
Title
Natural Resources - Hunting and Fishing License Applications - Social Security Number
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0514
Title
Recreational Hunting or Fishing License Applications - Disclosure of Information
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0789 (SB0715/CH0309)
Title
Maryland Highway Safety Act of 2013
Sponsor
Delegate Ivey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0849 (SB0579)
Title
Child Support - Adjusted Actual Income - Multifamily Adjustment
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0930
Title
Criminal Law - Identity Fraud - Prohibitions
Sponsor
Delegate Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0279 /CH0157 (HB0224/CH0158)
Title
Election Law - Improving Access to Voting
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0650
Title
Natural Resources - Hunting License Applications - Social Security Number
Sponsor
Senator Getty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0715 /CH0309 (HB0789)
Title
Maryland Highway Safety Act of 2013
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0224 /CH0158 (SB0279/CH0157) Election Law - Improving Access to Voting Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 158
Ways and Means
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0333 /CH0367 Family Investment Program - Couples Advancing Together Pilot Program Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 367
Appropriations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0505 Natural Resources - Hunting and Fishing License Applications - Social Security Number Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0514 Recreational Hunting or Fishing License Applications - Disclosure of Information Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0789 (SB0715/CH0309) Maryland Highway Safety Act of 2013 Delegate Ivey 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0849 (SB0579) Child Support - Adjusted Actual Income - Multifamily Adjustment Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0930 Criminal Law - Identity Fraud - Prohibitions Delegate Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0279 /CH0157 (HB0224/CH0158) Election Law - Improving Access to Voting President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 157
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0650 Natural Resources - Hunting License Applications - Social Security Number Senator Getty 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0715 /CH0309 (HB0789) Maryland Highway Safety Act of 2013 Senator Ramirez 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 309
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM