Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Social Security

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0378
Title
State Department of Education - Social Security Numbers of Students
Sponsor
Delegate Vogt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0524 /CH0815 (SB0291/CH0816)
Title
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0580 (SB0250)
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Prohibited Lease Provisions - Late Fees for Tenants Receiving Government Benefits
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0929
Title
Property Tax - Homeowners' Property Tax Credit - Definition of Gross Income
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1113
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Services for Children With Prader-Willi Syndrome
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1615 /CH0408 (SB1231)
Title
Human Services - Temporary Disability Assistance Program
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1638 (SB0788)
Title
Public Information Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0291 /CH0816 (HB0524/CH0815)
Title
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0788 (HB1638)
Title
Public Information Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1231 (HB1615/CH0408)
Title
Human Services - Temporary Disability Assistance Program
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0378 State Department of Education - Social Security Numbers of Students Delegate Vogt 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/04/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0524 /CH0815 (SB0291/CH0816) Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody Delegate Moon 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 815
Judiciary
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0580 (SB0250) Landlord and Tenant - Prohibited Lease Provisions - Late Fees for Tenants Receiving Government Benefits Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0929 Property Tax - Homeowners' Property Tax Credit - Definition of Gross Income Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1113 Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Services for Children With Prader-Willi Syndrome Delegate McMillan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1615 /CH0408 (SB1231) Human Services - Temporary Disability Assistance Program Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 408
Appropriations
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1638 (SB0788) Public Information Act - Revisions Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0291 /CH0816 (HB0524/CH0815) Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State Custody Senator Madaleno 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 816
Judicial Proceedings
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0788 (HB1638) Public Information Act - Revisions Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1231 (HB1615/CH0408) Human Services - Temporary Disability Assistance Program Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:55 PM
Click to return on the top page