Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Social Workers

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0806 /CH0391
Title
Health Occupations - State Board of Social Work Examiners - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Hubbard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0810
Title
Mental Health Professionals - Duty to Report Risk of Serious Harm - Firearm Safety
Sponsor
Delegate Simmons
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0876
Title
Child Abuse - Failure to Report - Civil Penalty, Fund, and Task Force
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0897 (SB0570)
Title
Professional Licensing and Certification Governing Bodies - Child Abuse Mandated Reporter Training and Discipline
Sponsor
Delegate Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1115 /CH0404 (SB0593)
Title
Health Occupations Boards - License Renewal, Investigation of Alleged Violations, and Immunity from Liability
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1245 (SB0822)
Title
Mental Health and Substance Use Disorder Safety Net Act of 2013
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1290 (SB0837)
Title
Health Occupations Boards - Disciplinary Procedures - Prohibition on Stays
Sponsor
Delegate Frank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1310 (SB0834)
Title
Health Care Malpractice Claims - Definition of "Health Care Provider"
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1320 /CH0413
Title
Baltimore City and Baltimore County - Child in Need of Supervision Pilot Program - Extension
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0094
Title
Child Abuse and Neglect - Notice and Reporting Requirements, Disclosure, and Task Force
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0382
Title
Mental Health - Emergency Evaluations - Surrender of Firearms
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0570 (HB0897)
Title
Professional Licensing and Certification Governing Bodies - Child Abuse Mandated Reporter Training and Discipline
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0593 (HB1115/CH0404)
Title
Health Occupations Boards - License Renewal, Investigation of Alleged Violations, and Immunity from Liability
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0822 (HB1245)
Title
Mental Health and Substance Use Disorder Safety Net Act of 2013
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0837 (HB1290)
Title
Health Occupations Boards - Disciplinary Procedures - Prohibition on Stays
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0806 /CH0391 Health Occupations - State Board of Social Work Examiners - Revisions Delegate Hubbard 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 391
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0810 Mental Health Professionals - Duty to Report Risk of Serious Harm - Firearm Safety Delegate Simmons 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/01/2013 - 12:00 PM
HB0876 Child Abuse - Failure to Report - Civil Penalty, Fund, and Task Force Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0897 (SB0570) Professional Licensing and Certification Governing Bodies - Child Abuse Mandated Reporter Training and Discipline Delegate Hough 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1115 /CH0404 (SB0593) Health Occupations Boards - License Renewal, Investigation of Alleged Violations, and Immunity from Liability Delegate Cullison 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 404
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Judicial Proceedings
HB1245 (SB0822) Mental Health and Substance Use Disorder Safety Net Act of 2013 Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1290 (SB0837) Health Occupations Boards - Disciplinary Procedures - Prohibition on Stays Delegate Frank 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1310 (SB0834) Health Care Malpractice Claims - Definition of "Health Care Provider" Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1320 /CH0413 Baltimore City and Baltimore County - Child in Need of Supervision Pilot Program - Extension Delegate Jones 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 413
Judiciary
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0094 Child Abuse and Neglect - Notice and Reporting Requirements, Disclosure, and Task Force Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2013 - 2:00 PM
SB0382 Mental Health - Emergency Evaluations - Surrender of Firearms Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0570 (HB0897) Professional Licensing and Certification Governing Bodies - Child Abuse Mandated Reporter Training and Discipline Senator Shank 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0593 (HB1115/CH0404) Health Occupations Boards - License Renewal, Investigation of Alleged Violations, and Immunity from Liability Senator Montgomery 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Health and Government Operations
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0822 (HB1245) Mental Health and Substance Use Disorder Safety Net Act of 2013 Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0837 (HB1290) Health Occupations Boards - Disciplinary Procedures - Prohibition on Stays Senator Young 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM