Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Social Workers

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0298 /CH0219
Title
Health Insurance - Licensed Clinical Professional Art Therapists - Reimbursement
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0352 (SB1106/CH0610)
Title
Health Care Practitioners - Use of Teletherapy
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0425 /CH0844 (SB0651/CH0843)
Title
Public Schools - Suspensions and Expulsions
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0515
Title
Hospitals - Establishment of Substance Use Treatment Program - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0519
Title
Public Health - Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Safer Drug Consumption Facility Program
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0869 /CH0580 (SB0553)
Title
Recovery Residence Residential Rights Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate Howard, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0981 (SB0664/CH0690)
Title
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1060
Title
State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Meetings and Timeliness of Certification and Licensure Issuance
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1113 (SB0988)
Title
Health Occupations - Maryland Community Health Worker Act
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1183 /CH0548 (SB0986/CH0549)
Title
State Board of Social Work Examiners - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0553 (HB0869/CH0580)
Title
Recovery Residence Residential Rights Protection Act
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0651 /CH0843 (HB0425/CH0844)
Title
Public Schools - Suspensions and Expulsions
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0664 /CH0690 (HB0981)
Title
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0986 /CH0549 (HB1183/CH0548)
Title
State Board of Social Work Examiners - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1106 /CH0610 (HB0352)
Title
Health Care Practitioners - Use of Teletherapy
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0298 /CH0219 Health Insurance - Licensed Clinical Professional Art Therapists - Reimbursement Delegate Kelly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 219
Health and Government Operations
2/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0352 (SB1106/CH0610) Health Care Practitioners - Use of Teletherapy Delegate Reznik 2 2 Veto sustained (0-140)
Health and Government Operations
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0425 /CH0844 (SB0651/CH0843) Public Schools - Suspensions and Expulsions Delegate Lierman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 844
Ways and Means
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0515 Hospitals - Establishment of Substance Use Treatment Program - Requirements Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0519 Public Health - Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Safer Drug Consumption Facility Program Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0869 /CH0580 (SB0553) Recovery Residence Residential Rights Protection Act Delegate Howard, S. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 580
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/06/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0981 (SB0664/CH0690) Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership Allegany County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Appropriations
3/02/2017 - 3:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1060 State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Meetings and Timeliness of Certification and Licensure Issuance Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1113 (SB0988) Health Occupations - Maryland Community Health Worker Act Delegate Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway)
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1183 /CH0548 (SB0986/CH0549) State Board of Social Work Examiners - Revisions Delegate West 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 548
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0553 (HB0869/CH0580) Recovery Residence Residential Rights Protection Act Senator Hershey 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0651 /CH0843 (HB0425/CH0844) Public Schools - Suspensions and Expulsions Senator Smith 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 843
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0664 /CH0690 (HB0981) Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 690
Budget and Taxation
3/02/2017 - 8:30 AM
Appropriations
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0986 /CH0549 (HB1183/CH0548) State Board of Social Work Examiners - Revisions Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 549
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB1106 /CH0610 (HB0352) Health Care Practitioners - Use of Teletherapy Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 610
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:51 PM