Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Somerset County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0348 (SB0468)
Title
Civil Right to Counsel - Implementation
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0638
Title
Natural Resources - Oysters - Shell Seeding, Shell Replenishment, and Rotational Harvest
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0841 (SB0855)
Title
Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Eastern Shore Counties - Warrant Intercept Program
Sponsor
Eastern Shore Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1089 (SB0196)
Title
Economic Development - Rural Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax Credit
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1155 (SB0906/CH0206)
Title
Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Selling Near Schools, Places of Worship, Public Libraries, and Youth Centers
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1273 (SB0928/CH0212)
Title
Somerset County Sanitary Commission - Enforcement of Liens - Tax Sale Authorization
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0196 (HB1089)
Title
Economic Development - Rural Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax Credit
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0468 (HB0348)
Title
Civil Right to Counsel - Implementation
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0855 (HB0841)
Title
Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Eastern Shore Counties - Warrant Intercept Program
Sponsor
Eastern Shore Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0906 /CH0206 (HB1155)
Title
Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Selling Near Schools, Places of Worship, Public Libraries, and Youth Centers
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0928 /CH0212 (HB1273)
Title
Somerset County Sanitary Commission - Enforcement of Liens - Tax Sale Authorization
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0348 (SB0468) Civil Right to Counsel - Implementation Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0638 Natural Resources - Oysters - Shell Seeding, Shell Replenishment, and Rotational Harvest Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0841 (SB0855) Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Eastern Shore Counties - Warrant Intercept Program Eastern Shore Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1089 (SB0196) Economic Development - Rural Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax Credit Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Economic Matters
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1155 (SB0906/CH0206) Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Selling Near Schools, Places of Worship, Public Libraries, and Youth Centers Delegate Otto 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1273 (SB0928/CH0212) Somerset County Sanitary Commission - Enforcement of Liens - Tax Sale Authorization Delegate Otto 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0196 (HB1089) Economic Development - Rural Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax Credit Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0468 (HB0348) Civil Right to Counsel - Implementation Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0855 (HB0841) Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Eastern Shore Counties - Warrant Intercept Program Eastern Shore Senators 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/18/2015 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0906 /CH0206 (HB1155) Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Selling Near Schools, Places of Worship, Public Libraries, and Youth Centers Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 206
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/08/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0928 /CH0212 (HB1273) Somerset County Sanitary Commission - Enforcement of Liens - Tax Sale Authorization Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 212
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2015 - 1:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM