Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Somerset County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0147 /CH0253 (SB0244)
Title
Somerset County Code of Public Local Laws - 2016 Edition - Legalization
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0148 /CH0166 (SB0134/CH0165)
Title
Somerset County - Sheriff - Salary
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0149 /CH0168 (SB0135/CH0167)
Title
Somerset County - Commissioners - Salary and Expense Reimbursements
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0152 (SB0136)
Title
Somerset County - State's Attorney - Salary
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0253 /CH0257 (SB0309)
Title
Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - City of Crisfield
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0298 (SB0133)
Title
Somerset County - Tax Exemption for Manufacturing Property - Duration
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0742
Title
Environment - Water Service Shut Off Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1097 (SB0729)
Title
Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Eastern Shore Counties - Warrant Intercept Program
Sponsor
Eastern Shore Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1167 /CH0503 (SB0680)
Title
Biotechnology Investment Tax Credit - Investment in Qualified Companies in Low-Income Areas
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1168 /CH0504 (SB0681)
Title
Cybersecurity Investment Tax Credit - Investment in Qualified Companies in Low-Income Areas
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0133 (HB0298)
Title
Somerset County - Tax Exemption for Manufacturing Property - Duration
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0134 /CH0165 (HB0148/CH0166)
Title
Somerset County - Sheriff - Salary
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0135 /CH0167 (HB0149/CH0168)
Title
Somerset County - Commissioners - Salary and Expense Reimbursements
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0136 (HB0152)
Title
Somerset County - State's Attorney - Salary
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0244 (HB0147/CH0253)
Title
Somerset County Code of Public Local Laws - 2016 Edition - Legalization
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0309 (HB0253/CH0257)
Title
Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - City of Crisfield
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0680 (HB1167/CH0503)
Title
Biotechnology Investment Tax Credit - Investment in Qualified Companies in Low-Income Areas
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0681 (HB1168/CH0504)
Title
Cybersecurity Investment Tax Credit - Investment in Qualified Companies in Low-Income Areas
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0728 (HB1143)
Title
Income Tax Credit - New Dwellings - Automatic Fire Sprinkler Systems
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0729 (HB1097)
Title
Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Eastern Shore Counties - Warrant Intercept Program
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0737
Title
Economic Development - Rural Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax Credit
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0738
Title
Economic Development - Maryland Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax Credit
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1061
Title
Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting - Statewide Authorization
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0147 /CH0253 (SB0244) Somerset County Code of Public Local Laws - 2016 Edition - Legalization Delegate Otto 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 253
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0148 /CH0166 (SB0134/CH0165) Somerset County - Sheriff - Salary Delegate Otto 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 166
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0149 /CH0168 (SB0135/CH0167) Somerset County - Commissioners - Salary and Expense Reimbursements Delegate Otto 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 168
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0152 (SB0136) Somerset County - State's Attorney - Salary Delegate Otto 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB0253 /CH0257 (SB0309) Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - City of Crisfield Delegate Otto 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 257
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0298 (SB0133) Somerset County - Tax Exemption for Manufacturing Property - Duration Delegate Otto 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB0742 Environment - Water Service Shut Off Protection Act Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1097 (SB0729) Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Eastern Shore Counties - Warrant Intercept Program Eastern Shore Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1167 /CH0503 (SB0680) Biotechnology Investment Tax Credit - Investment in Qualified Companies in Low-Income Areas Delegate Buckel 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 503
Ways and Means
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1168 /CH0504 (SB0681) Cybersecurity Investment Tax Credit - Investment in Qualified Companies in Low-Income Areas Delegate Buckel 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 504
Ways and Means
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0133 (HB0298) Somerset County - Tax Exemption for Manufacturing Property - Duration Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Budget and Taxation
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
SB0134 /CH0165 (HB0148/CH0166) Somerset County - Sheriff - Salary Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 165
Judicial Proceedings
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0135 /CH0167 (HB0149/CH0168) Somerset County - Commissioners - Salary and Expense Reimbursements Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 167
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0136 (HB0152) Somerset County - State's Attorney - Salary Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
SB0244 (HB0147/CH0253) Somerset County Code of Public Local Laws - 2016 Edition - Legalization Senator Mathias 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0309 (HB0253/CH0257) Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - City of Crisfield Senator Mathias 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Judicial Proceedings
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0680 (HB1167/CH0503) Biotechnology Investment Tax Credit - Investment in Qualified Companies in Low-Income Areas Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0681 (HB1168/CH0504) Cybersecurity Investment Tax Credit - Investment in Qualified Companies in Low-Income Areas Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0728 (HB1143) Income Tax Credit - New Dwellings - Automatic Fire Sprinkler Systems Senator Mathias 2 2 In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/11/2016 - 9:00 AM
SB0729 (HB1097) Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Eastern Shore Counties - Warrant Intercept Program Senator Hershey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0737 Economic Development - Rural Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax Credit Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 2:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/15/2016 - 2:30 PM
SB0738 Economic Development - Maryland Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax Credit Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 2:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/15/2016 - 2:30 PM
SB1061 Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting - Statewide Authorization Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:49 PM