Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Somerset County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0102 (SB0442)
Title
Toll Roads, Highways, and Bridges - County Government Consent Requirement - Expansion
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0212 (SB0107)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Toll Roads, Highways, and Bridges and Chesapeake Bay Crossing - Consent Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0290 /CH0616 (SB0337/CH0617)
Title
Somerset County – Alcoholic Beverages – Board of License Commissioners – Salaries
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0291 /CH0618 (SB0335/CH0619)
Title
Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Liquor Control Board Reserve Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0292 /CH0620 (SB0338/CH0621)
Title
Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Proximity to Places of Worship, Schools, Public Libraries, or Youth Centers
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0323 /CH0195 (SB0336/CH0194)
Title
Somerset County - Commissioners - Residency Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0840
Title
Environment - On-Site Wastewater Services - Regulation
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1277
Title
Real Property - Mortgages and Deeds of Trust - Foreclosure Actions
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1358
Title
Natural Resources - Oyster Severance Tax - Increase
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0107 (HB0212)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Toll Roads, Highways, and Bridges and Chesapeake Bay Crossing - Consent Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0335 /CH0619 (HB0291/CH0618)
Title
Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Liquor Control Board Reserve Fund
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0336 /CH0194 (HB0323/CH0195)
Title
Somerset County - Commissioners - Residency Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0337 /CH0617 (HB0290/CH0616)
Title
Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Board of License Commissioners - Salaries
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0338 /CH0621 (HB0292/CH0620)
Title
Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Proximity to Places of Worship, Schools, Public Libraries, or Youth Centers
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0442 (HB0102)
Title
Toll Roads, Highways, and Bridges - County Government Consent Requirement - Expansion
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0581 /CH0211 (HB1260)
Title
Economic, Housing, and Community Development – Opportunity Zone Incentives
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0102 (SB0442) Toll Roads, Highways, and Bridges - County Government Consent Requirement - Expansion Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0212 (SB0107) Anne Arundel County - Toll Roads, Highways, and Bridges and Chesapeake Bay Crossing - Consent Requirement Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0290 /CH0616 (SB0337/CH0617) Somerset County – Alcoholic Beverages – Board of License Commissioners – Salaries Delegate Otto 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 616
Economic Matters
2/18/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0291 /CH0618 (SB0335/CH0619) Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Liquor Control Board Reserve Fund Delegate Otto 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 618
Economic Matters
2/18/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0292 /CH0620 (SB0338/CH0621) Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Proximity to Places of Worship, Schools, Public Libraries, or Youth Centers Delegate Otto 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 620
Economic Matters
2/18/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0323 /CH0195 (SB0336/CH0194) Somerset County - Commissioners - Residency Requirements Delegate Otto 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 195
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0840 Environment - On-Site Wastewater Services - Regulation Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1277 Real Property - Mortgages and Deeds of Trust - Foreclosure Actions Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB1358 Natural Resources - Oyster Severance Tax - Increase Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0107 (HB0212) Anne Arundel County - Toll Roads, Highways, and Bridges and Chesapeake Bay Crossing - Consent Requirement Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0335 /CH0619 (HB0291/CH0618) Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Liquor Control Board Reserve Fund Senator Carozza 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 619
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0336 /CH0194 (HB0323/CH0195) Somerset County - Commissioners - Residency Requirements Senator Carozza 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 194
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0337 /CH0617 (HB0290/CH0616) Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Board of License Commissioners - Salaries Senator Carozza 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 617
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0338 /CH0621 (HB0292/CH0620) Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Proximity to Places of Worship, Schools, Public Libraries, or Youth Centers Senator Carozza 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 621
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0442 (HB0102) Toll Roads, Highways, and Bridges - County Government Consent Requirement - Expansion Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0581 /CH0211 (HB1260) Economic, Housing, and Community Development – Opportunity Zone Incentives Senator Ferguson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 211
Budget and Taxation
2/26/2019 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/02/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM