Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Special Education

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0162 (SB0172/CH0464)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2014
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0413 /CH0400
Title
Special Education - Individualized Education Program Parental Notice Requirements and Service Models List
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0518 (SB0489)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Youth in Transition School
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0798 /CH0330 (SB0701/CH0329)
Title
Education - Children With Disabilities - Habilitative Services Information
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1198 (SB0779)
Title
Education - Children With Disabilities - Due Process Hearings
Sponsor
Delegate Braveboy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1300
Title
Special Education - Visually Impaired Students - Orientation and Mobility Evaluation
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0120 /CH0136
Title
Education - Children With Disabilities - Parent Surrogates
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0172 /CH0464 (HB0162)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2014
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0489 (HB0518)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Youth in Transition School
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0701 /CH0329 (HB0798/CH0330)
Title
Education - Children With Disabilities - Habilitative Services Information
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0779 (HB1198)
Title
Education - Due Process Hearings for Children With Disabilities - Burden of Proof
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0162 (SB0172/CH0464) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2014 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0413 /CH0400 Special Education - Individualized Education Program Parental Notice Requirements and Service Models List Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 400
Ways and Means
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0518 (SB0489) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Youth in Transition School Delegate Jones 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2014 - 10:30 AM
HB0798 /CH0330 (SB0701/CH0329) Education - Children With Disabilities - Habilitative Services Information Delegate Kelly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 330
Ways and Means
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1198 (SB0779) Education - Children With Disabilities - Due Process Hearings Delegate Braveboy 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Ways and Means
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB1300 Special Education - Visually Impaired Students - Orientation and Mobility Evaluation Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0120 /CH0136 Education - Children With Disabilities - Parent Surrogates Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 136
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/15/2014 - 3:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0172 /CH0464 (HB0162) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2014 President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 464
Budget and Taxation
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0489 (HB0518) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Youth in Transition School Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 9:30 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2014 - 9:30 AM
SB0701 /CH0329 (HB0798/CH0330) Education - Children With Disabilities - Habilitative Services Information Senator Madaleno 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 329
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0779 (HB1198) Education - Due Process Hearings for Children With Disabilities - Burden of Proof Senator Montgomery 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM