Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Special Education

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0044 (SB0314)
Title
Special Education - IEP Translation Pilot Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0047
Title
Special Education - Loan Assistance Repayment and Paraprofessional Training
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0072 /CH0489 (SB0057)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0159
Title
Special Education - Standards and Workload Guidelines for Teachers and Related Services Providers
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0277 (SB0785)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - St. Elizabeth School Indoor Playground
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0278 /CH0411 (SB0015)
Title
Task Force to Study the Implementation of a Dyslexia Education Program
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0342
Title
Special Education - Related Services Providers - Consortium
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0344 (SB0390)
Title
Education - Due Process Hearings for Children With Disabilities - Burden of Proof
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0535 /CH0430 (SB0538)
Title
Blind or Visually Impaired Children - Individualized Education Programs - Orientation and Mobility Instruction
Sponsor
Delegate Turner
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0668
Title
Education - Due Process Hearings for Children With Disabilities - Attorney's Fees
Sponsor
Delegate McConkey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1060
Title
Special Education - Individualized Education Program Facilitated Meetings
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1069 (SB0677/CH0377)
Title
Education - Professional Development for Teachers and Providers of Early Childhood Education - Master Plan
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0015 (HB0278/CH0411)
Title
Task Force to Study the Implementation of a Dyslexia Education Program
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0057 (HB0072/CH0489)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0314 (HB0044)
Title
Special Education - Translations of Individualized Education Programs or Individualized Family Service Plans - Native Language
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0390 (HB0344)
Title
Education - Due Process Hearings for Children With Disabilities - Burden of Proof
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0538 (HB0535/CH0430)
Title
Blind or Visually Impaired Children - Individualized Education Programs - Orientation and Mobility Instruction
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0677 /CH0377 (HB1069)
Title
Education - Professional Development for Teachers and Providers of Early Childhood Education - Master Plan
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0785 (HB0277)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - St. Elizabeth School Indoor Playground
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0044 (SB0314) Special Education - IEP Translation Pilot Program - Establishment Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0047 Special Education - Loan Assistance Repayment and Paraprofessional Training Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0072 /CH0489 (SB0057) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015 Speaker 3 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489
Appropriations
3/03/2015 - 3:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0159 Special Education - Standards and Workload Guidelines for Teachers and Related Services Providers Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0277 (SB0785) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - St. Elizabeth School Indoor Playground Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/14/2015 - 2:00 PM
HB0278 /CH0411 (SB0015) Task Force to Study the Implementation of a Dyslexia Education Program Delegate Kaiser 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 411
Ways and Means
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0342 Special Education - Related Services Providers - Consortium Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0344 (SB0390) Education - Due Process Hearings for Children With Disabilities - Burden of Proof Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0535 /CH0430 (SB0538) Blind or Visually Impaired Children - Individualized Education Programs - Orientation and Mobility Instruction Delegate Turner 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 430
Ways and Means
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0668 Education - Due Process Hearings for Children With Disabilities - Attorney's Fees Delegate McConkey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1060 Special Education - Individualized Education Program Facilitated Meetings Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1069 (SB0677/CH0377) Education - Professional Development for Teachers and Providers of Early Childhood Education - Master Plan Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Ways and Means
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0015 (HB0278/CH0411) Task Force to Study the Implementation of a Dyslexia Education Program Senator Conway 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/22/2015 - 2:30 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0057 (HB0072/CH0489) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0314 (HB0044) Special Education - Translations of Individualized Education Programs or Individualized Family Service Plans - Native Language Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0390 (HB0344) Education - Due Process Hearings for Children With Disabilities - Burden of Proof Senator Montgomery 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0538 (HB0535/CH0430) Blind or Visually Impaired Children - Individualized Education Programs - Orientation and Mobility Instruction Senator Conway 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0677 /CH0377 (HB1069) Education - Professional Development for Teachers and Providers of Early Childhood Education - Master Plan Senator Ferguson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 377
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0785 (HB0277) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - St. Elizabeth School Indoor Playground Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 10:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/14/2015 - 10:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM