Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Special Education

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0271 (SB0117)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - TLC's Katherine Thomas School
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0493 (SB0638)
Title
Teachers and Teacher Preparation Programs - Research-Based Reading Instruction
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0496 (SB0339)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Ivymount School
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0910 (SB0548)
Title
Education - Students With Reading Difficulties - Screenings and Interventions
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0966 (SB1103)
Title
Education – Voluntary Ethical Special Education Advocate Certificate Program
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1254 /CH0775
Title
Education – School Discipline – Data Collection
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1489
Title
Education - Due Process Hearings for Children With Disabilities - Burden of Proof
Sponsor
Delegate Shoemaker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1533
Title
Students With a Disability - Brain Injury Screening - Evaluation for Individualized Education Program
Sponsor
Delegate Flanagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1791 (SB1214)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - St. Elizabeth School
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0117 (HB0271)
Title
Creation of a State Debt – Montgomery County – TLC’s Katherine Thomas School
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0339 (HB0496)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Ivymount School
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0548 (HB0910)
Title
Education – Students With Reading Difficulties – Screenings and Interventions
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0638 (HB0493)
Title
Teachers and Teacher Preparation Programs - Research-Based Reading Instruction
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1103 (HB0966)
Title
Education – Voluntary Ethical Special Education Advocate Certificate Program
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1213
Title
Public Schools - Student Discipline - Suspensions and Expulsions
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1214 (HB1791)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - St. Elizabeth School
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0271 (SB0117) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - TLC's Katherine Thomas School Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 5:00 PM
HB0493 (SB0638) Teachers and Teacher Preparation Programs - Research-Based Reading Instruction Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0496 (SB0339) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Ivymount School Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 5:00 PM
HB0910 (SB0548) Education - Students With Reading Difficulties - Screenings and Interventions Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Ways and Means
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0966 (SB1103) Education – Voluntary Ethical Special Education Advocate Certificate Program Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1254 /CH0775 Education – School Discipline – Data Collection Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 775
Ways and Means
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1489 Education - Due Process Hearings for Children With Disabilities - Burden of Proof Delegate Shoemaker 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1533 Students With a Disability - Brain Injury Screening - Evaluation for Individualized Education Program Delegate Flanagan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/09/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1791 (SB1214) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - St. Elizabeth School Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/12/2018 - 10:30 AM
SB0117 (HB0271) Creation of a State Debt – Montgomery County – TLC’s Katherine Thomas School Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 4:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 4:00 PM
SB0339 (HB0496) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Ivymount School Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 4:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 4:00 PM
SB0548 (HB0910) Education – Students With Reading Difficulties – Screenings and Interventions Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0638 (HB0493) Teachers and Teacher Preparation Programs - Research-Based Reading Instruction Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1103 (HB0966) Education – Voluntary Ethical Special Education Advocate Certificate Program Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1213 Public Schools - Student Discipline - Suspensions and Expulsions Senator Serafini 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1214 (HB1791) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - St. Elizabeth School Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 9:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2018 - 9:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:55 PM