Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Stadium Authority

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1619 /CH0575 (SB1148)
Title
Maryland Stadium Authority - Maryland Sports and Affiliated Foundations - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1148 (HB1619/CH0575)
Title
Maryland Stadium Authority - Maryland Sports and Affiliated Foundations - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1619 /CH0575 (SB1148) Maryland Stadium Authority - Maryland Sports and Affiliated Foundations - Establishment Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 575
Appropriations
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/06/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1148 (HB1619/CH0575) Maryland Stadium Authority - Maryland Sports and Affiliated Foundations - Establishment Senator Ferguson 2 2 Veto sustained (0-44)
Finance
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:51 PM