Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Stadium Authority

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0178 /CH0217 (SB0177/CH0218)
Title
Maryland Stadium Authority - Ocean City Convention Facility - Renovation
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0727 (SB0731)
Title
Build to Learn Act of 2019
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0801 /CH0695 (SB0799)
Title
Maryland Stadium Authority - Baltimore Convention Facility - Renovation
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1131 (SB0758)
Title
Baltimore County - Maryland Stadium Authority - Public School Construction
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1190 (SB0800)
Title
Maryland Stadium Authority’s Pimlico Race Course Study Workgroup
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1425 /CH0221
Title
Maryland Stadium Authority - Development of Supplemental Facilities to Benefit Camden Yards
Sponsor
Chair, Appropriations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0177 /CH0218 (HB0178/CH0217)
Title
Maryland Stadium Authority - Ocean City Convention Facility - Renovation
Sponsor
Minority Leader
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0641 (HB0668)
Title
Public School Construction - Maryland Stadium Authority - Montgomery County and Other School Systems With Significant Enrollment Growth
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0731 (HB0727)
Title
Public School Construction - Maryland Stadium Authority - Supplemental Funds
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0758 (HB1131)
Title
Baltimore County - Maryland Stadium Authority - Public School Construction
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0799 (HB0801/CH0695)
Title
Maryland Stadium Authority - Baltimore Convention Facility - Renovation
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0800 (HB1190)
Title
Maryland Stadium Authority’s Pimlico Race Course Study Workgroup
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0178 /CH0217 (SB0177/CH0218) Maryland Stadium Authority - Ocean City Convention Facility - Renovation Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 217
Appropriations
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0727 (SB0731) Build to Learn Act of 2019 Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0801 /CH0695 (SB0799) Maryland Stadium Authority - Baltimore Convention Facility - Renovation Delegate Glenn 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 695
Appropriations
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1131 (SB0758) Baltimore County - Maryland Stadium Authority - Public School Construction Delegate Young, P. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1190 (SB0800) Maryland Stadium Authority’s Pimlico Race Course Study Workgroup Delegate Glenn 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/01/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1425 /CH0221 Maryland Stadium Authority - Development of Supplemental Facilities to Benefit Camden Yards Chair, Appropriations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 221
Appropriations
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0177 /CH0218 (HB0178/CH0217) Maryland Stadium Authority - Ocean City Convention Facility - Renovation Minority Leader 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 218
Budget and Taxation
2/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0641 (HB0668) Public School Construction - Maryland Stadium Authority - Montgomery County and Other School Systems With Significant Enrollment Growth Senator Zucker 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0731 (HB0727) Public School Construction - Maryland Stadium Authority - Supplemental Funds Senator Zucker 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0758 (HB1131) Baltimore County - Maryland Stadium Authority - Public School Construction Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0799 (HB0801/CH0695) Maryland Stadium Authority - Baltimore Convention Facility - Renovation Senator Hayes 4 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0800 (HB1190) Maryland Stadium Authority’s Pimlico Race Course Study Workgroup Senator Hayes 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM