Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Stadiums

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0507 (SB0943)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Towson High School Stadium
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0624 (SB0571)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Watkins Mill High School Stadium Renovation
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0763
Title
Public Health - Synthetic Infill Turf Fields - Informational Signs
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0979 (SB1042)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Chesapeake High Stadium
Sponsor
Delegate Olszewski
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1376 (SB0948)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - Governor Thomas Johnson High School Stadium
Sponsor
Delegate Hogan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0394
Title
Statewide Container Recycling Refund Program
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0552 /CH0522
Title
Harford County - Class H-CC Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Sponsor
Senator Glassman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0571 (HB0624)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Watkins Mill High School Stadium Renovation
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0943 (HB0507)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Towson High School Stadium
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0948 (HB1376)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - Governor Thomas Johnson High School Stadium
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1042 (HB0979)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Chesapeake High Stadium
Sponsor
Senator Stone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0507 (SB0943) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Towson High School Stadium Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2014 - 9:00 AM
HB0624 (SB0571) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Watkins Mill High School Stadium Renovation Delegate Robinson, S. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
HB0763 Public Health - Synthetic Infill Turf Fields - Informational Signs Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0979 (SB1042) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Chesapeake High Stadium Delegate Olszewski 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2014 - 9:00 AM
HB1376 (SB0948) Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - Governor Thomas Johnson High School Stadium Delegate Hogan 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0394 Statewide Container Recycling Refund Program Senator Frosh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0552 /CH0522 Harford County - Class H-CC Alcoholic Beverages Licenses Senator Glassman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 522
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0571 (HB0624) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Watkins Mill High School Stadium Renovation Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Budget and Taxation
SB0943 (HB0507) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Towson High School Stadium Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 11:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2014 - 11:00 AM
SB0948 (HB1376) Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - Governor Thomas Johnson High School Stadium Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 3:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2014 - 3:00 PM
SB1042 (HB0979) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Chesapeake High Stadium Senator Stone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 12:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2014 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM