Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Stadiums

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0133
Title
Maryland Stadium Authority - Ocean City Convention Facility - Renovation
Sponsor
Chair, Appropriations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0506 /CH0094 (SB0220/CH0093)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Arena License
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0740 /CH0825 (SB0693/CH0826)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Website Domain Names
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0834 (SB1136)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - New Town High School Stadium
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1325 /CH0142
Title
Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class C License and Class C and Class D Per Diem Entertainment Venue Licenses Ho. Co. 20-18
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1343 /CH0649
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Stadium License
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0220 /CH0093 (HB0506/CH0094)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Arena License
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1136 (HB0834)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - New Town High School Stadium
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0133 Maryland Stadium Authority - Ocean City Convention Facility - Renovation Chair, Appropriations Committee 5 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Appropriations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0506 /CH0094 (SB0220/CH0093) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Arena License Frederick County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 94
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0740 /CH0825 (SB0693/CH0826) Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Website Domain Names Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 825
Economic Matters
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0834 (SB1136) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - New Town High School Stadium Delegate Hettleman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/12/2018 - 10:30 AM
HB1325 /CH0142 Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class C License and Class C and Class D Per Diem Entertainment Venue Licenses Ho. Co. 20-18 Howard County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 142
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1343 /CH0649 Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Stadium License Harford County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 649
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0220 /CH0093 (HB0506/CH0094) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Arena License Senator Young 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 93
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB1136 (HB0834) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - New Town High School Stadium Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 9:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2018 - 9:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:56 PM