Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Stadiums

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0178 /CH0217 (SB0177/CH0218)
Title
Maryland Stadium Authority - Ocean City Convention Facility - Renovation
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1092 (SB0468)
Title
Board of Public Works - Exchange of State Real Property - Limitation
Sponsor
Delegate Ivey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1415 (SB0709)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Website Domain
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1425 /CH0221
Title
Maryland Stadium Authority - Development of Supplemental Facilities to Benefit Camden Yards
Sponsor
Chair, Appropriations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0177 /CH0218 (HB0178/CH0217)
Title
Maryland Stadium Authority - Ocean City Convention Facility - Renovation
Sponsor
Minority Leader
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0468 (HB1092)
Title
Board of Public Works - Exchange of State Real Property - Limitation
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0709 (HB1415)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Website Domain
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0178 /CH0217 (SB0177/CH0218) Maryland Stadium Authority - Ocean City Convention Facility - Renovation Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 217
Appropriations
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1092 (SB0468) Board of Public Works - Exchange of State Real Property - Limitation Delegate Ivey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1415 (SB0709) Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Website Domain Delegate Adams 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1425 /CH0221 Maryland Stadium Authority - Development of Supplemental Facilities to Benefit Camden Yards Chair, Appropriations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 221
Appropriations
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0177 /CH0218 (HB0178/CH0217) Maryland Stadium Authority - Ocean City Convention Facility - Renovation Minority Leader 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 218
Budget and Taxation
2/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0468 (HB1092) Board of Public Works - Exchange of State Real Property - Limitation Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0709 (HB1415) Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Website Domain Senator Beidle 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM