Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

State Hospitals

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0027 /CH0394
Title
Task Force on the Disposition of the Crownsville Hospital Center Property
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0435
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Award of Grant - Study of Past Practices at State Psychiatric Institutions
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0924 (SB0272)
Title
Requirements for Filial Support - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1053 (SB0697)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Workgroup to Evaluate Mental Health Care Delivery on the Eastern Shore
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1109 /CH0469
Title
Behavioral Health Administration - Powers, Duties, and Responsibilities
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1122 (SB0792/CH0383)
Title
Public Health - Nondiscrimination in Access to Anatomical Gifts and Organ Transplantation
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0195 /CH0330
Title
Mental Health - Voluntary and Involuntary Admissions - Assent and Certification by Psychiatric Nurse Practitioners
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0272 (HB0924)
Title
Requirements for Filial Support - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0697 (HB1053)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Workgroup to Evaluate Mental Health Care Delivery on the Eastern Shore
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0792 /CH0383 (HB1122)
Title
Public Health - Nondiscrimination in Access to Anatomical Gifts and Organ Transplantation
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0027 /CH0394 Task Force on the Disposition of the Crownsville Hospital Center Property Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 394
Environment and Transportation
2/05/2015 - 2:00 PM
Finance
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0435 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Award of Grant - Study of Past Practices at State Psychiatric Institutions Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0924 (SB0272) Requirements for Filial Support - Repeal Delegate Kelly 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1053 (SB0697) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Workgroup to Evaluate Mental Health Care Delivery on the Eastern Shore Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1109 /CH0469 Behavioral Health Administration - Powers, Duties, and Responsibilities Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 469
Health and Government Operations
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/13/2015 - 9:00 AM
HB1122 (SB0792/CH0383) Public Health - Nondiscrimination in Access to Anatomical Gifts and Organ Transplantation Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0195 /CH0330 Mental Health - Voluntary and Involuntary Admissions - Assent and Certification by Psychiatric Nurse Practitioners Senator Eckardt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 330
Finance
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0272 (HB0924) Requirements for Filial Support - Repeal Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0697 (HB1053) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Workgroup to Evaluate Mental Health Care Delivery on the Eastern Shore Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0792 /CH0383 (HB1122) Public Health - Nondiscrimination in Access to Anatomical Gifts and Organ Transplantation Senator Astle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 383
Finance
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM