Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

State Prosecutor

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0073 /CH0396 (SB0192)
Title
Voters' Rights Protection Act of 2015
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0112 (SB0653)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Police-Involved Death - State Prosecutor
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0438
Title
Criminal Procedure - State Prosecutor - Use of Force by Law Enforcement Officer
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0813
Title
State Prosecutor - Law Enforcement Officer-Involved Deaths
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0192 (HB0073/CH0396)
Title
Voters' Rights Protection Act of 2015
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0653 (HB0112)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Police-Involved Death - State Prosecutor
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0755 /CH0380
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance - Central Committee Candidates
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0073 /CH0396 (SB0192) Voters' Rights Protection Act of 2015 Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 396
Ways and Means
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0112 (SB0653) Criminal Procedure - Police-Involved Death - State Prosecutor Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0438 Criminal Procedure - State Prosecutor - Use of Force by Law Enforcement Officer Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0813 State Prosecutor - Law Enforcement Officer-Involved Deaths Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0192 (HB0073/CH0396) Voters' Rights Protection Act of 2015 Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0653 (HB0112) Criminal Procedure - Police-Involved Death - State Prosecutor Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0755 /CH0380 Election Law - Campaign Finance - Central Committee Candidates Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 380
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM