Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

State's Attorneys

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0023
Title
Criminal Procedure - Vulnerable Adult Abuse Registry
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0365
Title
Criminal Procedure - Felony Prosecution of Law Enforcement Officer - Attorney General
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0457
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Law Enforcement Officer, Correctional Officer, First Responder, or Witness
Sponsor
Delegate McDonough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0492
Title
Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate Afzali
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0495
Title
Criminal Law - Drug Paraphernalia Possession of Less Than 10 Grams of Marijuana - Code Violation
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0553 (SB0585)
Title
Maryland No-Fault Injured Baby Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0737 /CH0337 (SB0288/CH0336)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Financial Crimes Against Vulnerable and Elder Adults - Petition to Freeze Assets
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0924 (SB0272)
Title
Requirements for Filial Support - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1059 (SB0686)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Maryland Uniform Collateral Consequences of Conviction Act
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, D.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0272 (HB0924)
Title
Requirements for Filial Support - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0288 /CH0336 (HB0737/CH0337)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Financial Crimes Against Vulnerable and Elder Adults - Petition to Freeze Assets
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0585 (HB0553)
Title
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0686 (HB1059)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Maryland Uniform Collateral Consequences of Conviction Act
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0755 /CH0380
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance - Central Committee Candidates
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0933
Title
Courts - Evidence of Prior Sexual Offense - Admissibility
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0023 Criminal Procedure - Vulnerable Adult Abuse Registry Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
1/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0365 Criminal Procedure - Felony Prosecution of Law Enforcement Officer - Attorney General Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0457 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Law Enforcement Officer, Correctional Officer, First Responder, or Witness Delegate McDonough 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0492 Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act Delegate Afzali 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/16/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0495 Criminal Law - Drug Paraphernalia Possession of Less Than 10 Grams of Marijuana - Code Violation Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0553 (SB0585) Maryland No-Fault Injured Baby Fund Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Health and Government Operations
3/16/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB0737 /CH0337 (SB0288/CH0336) Criminal Procedure - Financial Crimes Against Vulnerable and Elder Adults - Petition to Freeze Assets Delegate Wilson, B. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 337
Judiciary
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0924 (SB0272) Requirements for Filial Support - Repeal Delegate Kelly 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1059 (SB0686) Criminal Procedure - Maryland Uniform Collateral Consequences of Conviction Act Delegate Barnes, D. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0272 (HB0924) Requirements for Filial Support - Repeal Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0288 /CH0336 (HB0737/CH0337) Criminal Procedure - Financial Crimes Against Vulnerable and Elder Adults - Petition to Freeze Assets Senator Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 336
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0585 (HB0553) Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0686 (HB1059) Criminal Procedure - Maryland Uniform Collateral Consequences of Conviction Act Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0755 /CH0380 Election Law - Campaign Finance - Central Committee Candidates Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 380
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0933 Courts - Evidence of Prior Sexual Offense - Admissibility Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM