Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Statutes of Limitation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0013 (SB0238)
Title
Criminal Procedure – Partial Expungement and Expungement of Misdemeanor Conviction
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0074
Title
Criminal Procedure - Coram Nobis - Time for Filing
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0425 /CH0650
Title
Civil Actions - Unfair, Abusive, or Deceptive Trade Practices by Mortgage Servicer - Statute of Limitations
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0493 /CH0246
Title
Crimes – Solicitation and Conspiracy to Commit Murder Resulting in Death (Stacey’s Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0682
Title
Procurement - Prohibited Russian Entities
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0687
Title
Civil Actions – Child Sexual Abuse – Definition and Statute of Limitations (Hidden Predator Act of 2019)
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0743 (SB0242)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Incompetency and Criminal Responsibility - Dismissal of Charges
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0787 /CH0054
Title
Crimes - Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1023
Title
Criminal Procedure - Maryland Violent Offender Registry
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1069
Title
Child Abuse and Neglect - Required Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1320 (SB0869)
Title
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0098
Title
Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Child Support
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0242 (HB0743)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Incompetency and Criminal Responsibility - Dismissal of Charges
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0295
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0484 /CH0225
Title
Tax Liens - Expiration
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0568 /CH0053
Title
Crimes - Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0813
Title
Personal Injury or Wrongful Death - Noneconomic Damages
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0869 (HB1320)
Title
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1034
Title
Civil Actions - Family Caregiver Reimbursement
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0013 (SB0238) Criminal Procedure – Partial Expungement and Expungement of Misdemeanor Conviction Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Judiciary
1/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0074 Criminal Procedure - Coram Nobis - Time for Filing Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0425 /CH0650 Civil Actions - Unfair, Abusive, or Deceptive Trade Practices by Mortgage Servicer - Statute of Limitations Delegate Sydnor 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 650
Judiciary
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0493 /CH0246 Crimes – Solicitation and Conspiracy to Commit Murder Resulting in Death (Stacey’s Law) Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 246
Judiciary
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0682 Procurement - Prohibited Russian Entities Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0687 Civil Actions – Child Sexual Abuse – Definition and Statute of Limitations (Hidden Predator Act of 2019) Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0743 (SB0242) Criminal Procedure - Incompetency and Criminal Responsibility - Dismissal of Charges Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Judiciary
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0787 /CH0054 Crimes - Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 54
Judiciary
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1023 Criminal Procedure - Maryland Violent Offender Registry Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1069 Child Abuse and Neglect - Required Reporting Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1320 (SB0869) Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0098 Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Child Support Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2019 - 2:00 PM
SB0242 (HB0743) Criminal Procedure - Incompetency and Criminal Responsibility - Dismissal of Charges Senator Lee 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0295 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0484 /CH0225 Tax Liens - Expiration Senator Ferguson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 225
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0568 /CH0053 Crimes - Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report Senator Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 53
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0813 Personal Injury or Wrongful Death - Noneconomic Damages Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0869 (HB1320) Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2019 - 12:00 PM
Finance
SB1034 Civil Actions - Family Caregiver Reimbursement Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2019 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM