Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

St. Mary's County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0055
Title
Calvert and St. Mary's Counties - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0184 (SB0842)
Title
St. Mary's County - Personal Property Tax - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Morgan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0212
Title
Higher Education - College of Southern Maryland - Bachelor's Degree Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0286 /CH0083
Title
Calvert and St. Mary's Counties - Scenic Byways - Signs
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0359 (SB0280)
Title
Income Tax Credit - Qualified Farms - Food Donation Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0599 /CH0439 (SB0839)
Title
St. Mary's County - Violations of Ordinances, Rules, and Regulations - Penalties
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0600 /CH0440 (SB0840)
Title
St. Mary's County - Property Maintenance - Voluntary Agreements
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0616 (SB0838/CH0386)
Title
St. Mary's County - Animal Regulations
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0638
Title
Natural Resources - Oysters - Shell Seeding, Shell Replenishment, and Rotational Harvest
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1089 (SB0196)
Title
Economic Development - Rural Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax Credit
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0068 /CH0147
Title
Charles County and St. Mary's County - Deer Management Permit
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0196 (HB1089)
Title
Economic Development - Rural Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax Credit
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0280 (HB0359)
Title
Income Tax Credit - Qualified Farms - Food Donation Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0838 /CH0386 (HB0616)
Title
St. Mary's County - Animal Regulations
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0839 (HB0599/CH0439)
Title
St. Mary's County - Violations of Ordinances, Rules, and Regulations - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0840 (HB0600/CH0440)
Title
St. Mary's County - Property Maintenance - Voluntary Agreements
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0842 (HB0184)
Title
St. Mary's County - Personal Property Tax - Exemption
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0909 /CH0207
Title
Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Financing Purchase or Lease of Property by Other Entities
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0055 Calvert and St. Mary's Counties - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 In the Senate - Senate Refuses to Recede
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0184 (SB0842) St. Mary's County - Personal Property Tax - Exemption Delegate Morgan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0212 Higher Education - College of Southern Maryland - Bachelor's Degree Programs Delegate Fisher 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0286 /CH0083 Calvert and St. Mary's Counties - Scenic Byways - Signs Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 83
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0359 (SB0280) Income Tax Credit - Qualified Farms - Food Donation Pilot Program Delegate Jameson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0599 /CH0439 (SB0839) St. Mary's County - Violations of Ordinances, Rules, and Regulations - Penalties St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 439
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0600 /CH0440 (SB0840) St. Mary's County - Property Maintenance - Voluntary Agreements St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 440
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0616 (SB0838/CH0386) St. Mary's County - Animal Regulations St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0638 Natural Resources - Oysters - Shell Seeding, Shell Replenishment, and Rotational Harvest Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1089 (SB0196) Economic Development - Rural Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax Credit Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Economic Matters
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0068 /CH0147 Charles County and St. Mary's County - Deer Management Permit Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 147
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/03/2015 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0196 (HB1089) Economic Development - Rural Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax Credit Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0280 (HB0359) Income Tax Credit - Qualified Farms - Food Donation Pilot Program Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0838 /CH0386 (HB0616) St. Mary's County - Animal Regulations Senator Waugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 386
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0839 (HB0599/CH0439) St. Mary's County - Violations of Ordinances, Rules, and Regulations - Penalties Senator Waugh 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0840 (HB0600/CH0440) St. Mary's County - Property Maintenance - Voluntary Agreements Senator Waugh 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0842 (HB0184) St. Mary's County - Personal Property Tax - Exemption Senator Waugh 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB0909 /CH0207 Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Financing Purchase or Lease of Property by Other Entities Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 207
Finance
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM