Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

St. Mary's County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0088
Title
St. Mary's County - Alcoholic Beverages - On-Site Consumption Permit
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0089
Title
St. Mary's County - Emergency Snow Routes - Authority
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0090
Title
St. Mary's County - Agricultural Land Preservation Program - Installment Purchase Agreements - Repeal
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0097 (SB0261)
Title
St. Mary's County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0121
Title
St. Mary's County - Metropolitan Commission - Nonsubstantive and Clarifying Revisions
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0155
Title
St. Mary's County - Emergency Services Tax Revenue - Authorized Use
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0173
Title
Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0176
Title
St. Mary's County Open Meetings Act - Closed Sessions
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0387 (SB0805)
Title
Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Funding
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0414
Title
St. Mary's County - Property Tax Credit - Improvements to Commercial Real Property
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0440
Title
St. Mary's County Open Meetings Act - Public Agencies and Use of New Technology
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0443 (SB0430)
Title
Southern Maryland Code Counties - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0482 (SB0428)
Title
Southern Maryland - Homeowners Association Commission - Alternative Dispute Resolution Authority
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1300 (SB1000)
Title
Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Implementation
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1353
Title
Natural Resources - Oyster Severance Tax - Increase
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0261 (HB0097)
Title
St. Mary's County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0428 (HB0482)
Title
Southern Maryland - Homeowners Association Commission - Alternative Dispute Resolution Authority
Sponsor
Charles County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0430 (HB0443)
Title
Southern Maryland Code Counties - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Charles County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0508
Title
St. Mary's County - Possession of Tobacco Product or Electronic Smoking Device by an Individual Under the Age of 21 Years - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0805 (HB0387)
Title
Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Funding
Sponsor
Charles County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0930
Title
Natural Resources - Resident Canada Geese - Restrictions on Shooting in Charles County
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1000 (HB1300)
Title
Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Implementation
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0088 St. Mary's County - Alcoholic Beverages - On-Site Consumption Permit St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB0089 St. Mary's County - Emergency Snow Routes - Authority St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0090 St. Mary's County - Agricultural Land Preservation Program - Installment Purchase Agreements - Repeal St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0097 (SB0261) St. Mary's County - Public Facilities Bond St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
1/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0121 St. Mary's County - Metropolitan Commission - Nonsubstantive and Clarifying Revisions St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0155 St. Mary's County - Emergency Services Tax Revenue - Authorized Use St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0173 Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0176 St. Mary's County Open Meetings Act - Closed Sessions St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0387 (SB0805) Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Funding Charles County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0414 St. Mary's County - Property Tax Credit - Improvements to Commercial Real Property St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0440 St. Mary's County Open Meetings Act - Public Agencies and Use of New Technology St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0443 (SB0430) Southern Maryland Code Counties - Collective Bargaining Charles County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0482 (SB0428) Southern Maryland - Homeowners Association Commission - Alternative Dispute Resolution Authority Charles County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1300 (SB1000) Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Implementation Speaker 6 2 In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 12:00 p.m. (Appropriations) and Hearing 2/17 at 12:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Appropriations
2/17/2020 - 12:00 PM
Ways and Means
2/17/2020 - 12:00 PM
HB1353 Natural Resources - Oyster Severance Tax - Increase Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0261 (HB0097) St. Mary's County - Public Facilities Bond Senator Bailey 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Budget and Taxation
1/29/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0428 (HB0482) Southern Maryland - Homeowners Association Commission - Alternative Dispute Resolution Authority Charles County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0430 (HB0443) Southern Maryland Code Counties - Collective Bargaining Charles County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0508 St. Mary's County - Possession of Tobacco Product or Electronic Smoking Device by an Individual Under the Age of 21 Years - Prohibition Senator Bailey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0805 (HB0387) Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Funding Charles County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/18/2020 - 2:00 PM
SB0930 Natural Resources - Resident Canada Geese - Restrictions on Shooting in Charles County Senator Bailey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB1000 (HB1300) Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Implementation President 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 12:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2020 - 12:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 2/17/2020 4:24 PM