Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Storage

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0085
Title
Business Regulation - Automated Purchasing Machines - Requirements and Records
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0287
Title
Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Brewery Licenses
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0338
Title
Business Regulation - Automated Purchasing Machines - Licensing of Operators and Required Records
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0409
Title
Environment - Hydraulic Fracturing Wastewater - Prohibited Acts
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0603 (SB0490/CH0174)
Title
Limited Lines Insurance Licenses - Self-Service Storage Producers
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0680
Title
Public Safety - DNA Samples and Records - Collection, Use, Storage, and Expungement
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0736 (SB0251)
Title
Public Schools and Institutions of Higher Education - Artificial Trans Fat - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0918 (SB0382/CH0161)
Title
Business Regulation - Automated Purchasing Machines - Licensing of Buyers and Required Records
Sponsor
Delegate Costa
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1088 /CH0640
Title
Health Occupations - Compound Drugs - Provision to Ophthalmologists for Office Use
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1467
Title
Vehicle Laws - Towing, Recovery, and Storage - Methods of Payment
Sponsor
Delegate Minnick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0234
Title
Criminal Procedure - Reports to Crimesolvers/Crimestoppers Organization - Inadmissibility and Confidentiality
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0250 /CH0286
Title
Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Brewery Licenses
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0251 (HB0736)
Title
Public Schools and Institutions of Higher Education - Artificial Trans Fat - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0382 /CH0161 (HB0918)
Title
Business Regulation - Automated Purchasing Machines - Licensing of Buyers and Required Records
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0490 /CH0174 (HB0603)
Title
Limited Lines Insurance Licenses - Self-Service Storage Producers
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0678 /CH0325
Title
Maryland Oil Disaster Containment, Clean-Up and Contingency Fund and Oil Contaminated Site Environmental Cleanup Fund
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0764 /CH0337
Title
Caroline County - Volunteer Fire Companies - Storage of Alcoholic Beverages
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0924 (HB0912/CH0242)
Title
Courts - Electronic Communications - Privacy
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1092
Title
Health General - Milk Products - Direct-to-Consumer Sale of Raw Milk
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0085 Business Regulation - Automated Purchasing Machines - Requirements and Records Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0287 Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Brewery Licenses Delegate Otto 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0338 Business Regulation - Automated Purchasing Machines - Licensing of Operators and Required Records Delegate Clippinger 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0409 Environment - Hydraulic Fracturing Wastewater - Prohibited Acts Delegate Robinson, S. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0603 (SB0490/CH0174) Limited Lines Insurance Licenses - Self-Service Storage Producers Delegate Jameson 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0680 Public Safety - DNA Samples and Records - Collection, Use, Storage, and Expungement Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0736 (SB0251) Public Schools and Institutions of Higher Education - Artificial Trans Fat - Prohibition Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB0918 (SB0382/CH0161) Business Regulation - Automated Purchasing Machines - Licensing of Buyers and Required Records Delegate Costa 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1088 /CH0640 Health Occupations - Compound Drugs - Provision to Ophthalmologists for Office Use Delegate Morhaim 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 640
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1467 Vehicle Laws - Towing, Recovery, and Storage - Methods of Payment Delegate Minnick 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0234 Criminal Procedure - Reports to Crimesolvers/Crimestoppers Organization - Inadmissibility and Confidentiality Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0250 /CH0286 Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Brewery Licenses Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 286
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0251 (HB0736) Public Schools and Institutions of Higher Education - Artificial Trans Fat - Prohibition Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0382 /CH0161 (HB0918) Business Regulation - Automated Purchasing Machines - Licensing of Buyers and Required Records Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 161
Finance
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0490 /CH0174 (HB0603) Limited Lines Insurance Licenses - Self-Service Storage Producers Senator Astle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 174
Finance
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0678 /CH0325 Maryland Oil Disaster Containment, Clean-Up and Contingency Fund and Oil Contaminated Site Environmental Cleanup Fund Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 325
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0764 /CH0337 Caroline County - Volunteer Fire Companies - Storage of Alcoholic Beverages Senator Colburn 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 337
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0924 (HB0912/CH0242) Courts - Electronic Communications - Privacy Senator Raskin 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB1092 Health General - Milk Products - Direct-to-Consumer Sale of Raw Milk Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 11:00 a.m.
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM