Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Storage

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0108 (SB0037)
Title
Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0415
Title
Cedar Hope Chests - Prohibition on Manufacture, Import, and Sale (McKenna's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0458
Title
Environment - Exploration and Production Waste and Waste From Hydraulic Fracturing
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0523
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Garrett County - Multiple Event License
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0656
Title
Electricity - Energy Storage - Fuel Cells (Stored Energy and Power (StEP) Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0658 (SB0344/CH0342)
Title
Public Health - Emergency and Allergy Treatment Program
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0689 /CH0449 (SB0523)
Title
Worcester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Limited Distillery License
Sponsor
Delegate Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0786 /CH0103 (SB0613)
Title
Self-Service Storage Facilities - Enforcement of Lien - Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0945 (SB0626/CH0044)
Title
Registered Nurses - Local Health Departments - Requirements for Personally Preparing and Dispensing Drugs and Devices
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0035
Title
Baltimore County - Miscellaneous Business Licenses - Fees
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0037 (HB0108)
Title
Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0229
Title
Calvert County - Sale or Distribution of Tobacco and Related Products - Civil Penalties
Sponsor
Calvert County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0344 /CH0342 (HB0658)
Title
Public Health - Emergency and Allergy Treatment Program
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0523 (HB0689/CH0449)
Title
Worcester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Limited Distillery License
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0613 (HB0786/CH0103)
Title
Self-Service Storage Facilities - Enforcement of Lien - Procedures
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0626 /CH0044 (HB0945)
Title
Registered Nurses - Local Health Departments - Requirements for Personally Preparing and Dispensing Drugs and Devices
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0715 /CH0194
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Garrett County - Multiple Event License
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0812
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Limited Distillery License
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0911
Title
Comptroller - Special Event Liquor Permit
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0108 (SB0037) Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB0415 Cedar Hope Chests - Prohibition on Manufacture, Import, and Sale (McKenna's Law) Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0458 Environment - Exploration and Production Waste and Waste From Hydraulic Fracturing Delegate Robinson, S. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0523 Alcoholic Beverages - Garrett County - Multiple Event License Delegate Beitzel 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0656 Electricity - Energy Storage - Fuel Cells (Stored Energy and Power (StEP) Act) Delegate Korman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/20/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0658 (SB0344/CH0342) Public Health - Emergency and Allergy Treatment Program Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Health and Government Operations
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0689 /CH0449 (SB0523) Worcester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Limited Distillery License Delegate Carozza 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 449
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0786 /CH0103 (SB0613) Self-Service Storage Facilities - Enforcement of Lien - Procedures Delegate Davis 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 103
Economic Matters
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0945 (SB0626/CH0044) Registered Nurses - Local Health Departments - Requirements for Personally Preparing and Dispensing Drugs and Devices Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0035 Baltimore County - Miscellaneous Business Licenses - Fees Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0037 (HB0108) Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
2/04/2015 - 2:00 PM
Finance
SB0229 Calvert County - Sale or Distribution of Tobacco and Related Products - Civil Penalties Calvert County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0344 /CH0342 (HB0658) Public Health - Emergency and Allergy Treatment Program Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 342
Finance
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0523 (HB0689/CH0449) Worcester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Limited Distillery License Senator Mathias 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0613 (HB0786/CH0103) Self-Service Storage Facilities - Enforcement of Lien - Procedures Senator Astle 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Finance
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0626 /CH0044 (HB0945) Registered Nurses - Local Health Departments - Requirements for Personally Preparing and Dispensing Drugs and Devices Senator Montgomery 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 44
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0715 /CH0194 Alcoholic Beverages - Garrett County - Multiple Event License Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 194
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0812 Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Limited Distillery License Senator Reilly 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0911 Comptroller - Special Event Liquor Permit Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM