Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Storage

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0071 (SB0514)
Title
Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0386 (SB0834)
Title
Income Tax Credit - Energy Storage Systems
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0787
Title
Electricity - Energy Storage Systems (Storage Technology and Electric Power (STEP) Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0821
Title
Energy Storage Portfolio Standard (Storage Technology and Electric Power (STEP) Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1161 /CH0135
Title
Municipalities - Boat Docking and Storage - User Fees - Authorized Uses
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1391
Title
Large Family Child Care Homes and Child Care Centers - Green Product Cleaning Supplies - Regulations
Sponsor
Delegate Angel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1418 (SB0898)
Title
Public Health - Emergency Use Auto-Injectable Epinephrine Program for Food Service Facilities
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1467
Title
Department of Human Resources - Housing Counselor and Aftercare Program
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0514 (HB0071)
Title
Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0630 /CH0418
Title
Comptroller - Distillery Off-Site Permit and Liquor Festival Permit
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0724 /CH0041
Title
Alcoholic Beverages Article
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0834 (HB0386)
Title
Income Tax Credit - Energy Storage Systems
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0898 (HB1418)
Title
Public Health - Auto-Injectable Epinephrine - Certification for Emergency Administration
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1082
Title
State Board of Dental Examiners - Ownership, Management, and Operation of a Dental Practice
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0071 (SB0514) Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB0386 (SB0834) Income Tax Credit - Energy Storage Systems Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0787 Electricity - Energy Storage Systems (Storage Technology and Electric Power (STEP) Act) Delegate Korman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0821 Energy Storage Portfolio Standard (Storage Technology and Electric Power (STEP) Act) Delegate Korman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1161 /CH0135 Municipalities - Boat Docking and Storage - User Fees - Authorized Uses Delegate Lisanti 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 135
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1391 Large Family Child Care Homes and Child Care Centers - Green Product Cleaning Supplies - Regulations Delegate Angel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1418 (SB0898) Public Health - Emergency Use Auto-Injectable Epinephrine Program for Food Service Facilities Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1467 Department of Human Resources - Housing Counselor and Aftercare Program Delegate Krimm 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0514 (HB0071) Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0630 /CH0418 Comptroller - Distillery Off-Site Permit and Liquor Festival Permit Senator Hershey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 418
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0724 /CH0041 Alcoholic Beverages Article President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 41
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0834 (HB0386) Income Tax Credit - Energy Storage Systems Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0898 (HB1418) Public Health - Auto-Injectable Epinephrine - Certification for Emergency Administration Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1082 State Board of Dental Examiners - Ownership, Management, and Operation of a Dental Practice Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing cancelled
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:49 PM