Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Subpoenas

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0244 /CH0089
Title
Correctional Services - Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services - Subpoena Power
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0346 /CH0031 (SB0216/CH0030)
Title
Harford County - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0474 (SB0611)
Title
Health Occupations - Maryland Behavior Analysts Act
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0570
Title
State Government - Inspector General
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0806 /CH0391
Title
Health Occupations - State Board of Social Work Examiners - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Hubbard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1029 (SB0783)
Title
State Board of Physicians - Naturopathic Doctors
Sponsor
Delegate Oaks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1096 /CH0401 (SB0672)
Title
State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
Delegate Hammen
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1255
Title
Motor Vehicles - Towing Services - Licensing
Sponsor
Delegate Niemann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1257 /CH0674
Title
Land Use - Clarifications and Corrections
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1481 (SB0557/CH0287)
Title
Medical Records - Disclosure in Response to Compulsory Process
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0169
Title
Criminal Procedure - Reports to Crimesolvers/Crimestoppers Organization - Inadmissibility and Confidentiality
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0216 /CH0030 (HB0346/CH0031)
Title
Harford County - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights
Sponsor
Senator Glassman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0557 /CH0287 (HB1481)
Title
Medical Records - Disclosure in Response to Compulsory Process
Sponsor
Senator Stone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0611 (HB0474)
Title
Health Occupations - Maryland Behavior Analysts Act
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0672 (HB1096/CH0401)
Title
State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
Senator Conway
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0783 (HB1029)
Title
State Board of Physicians - Naturopathic Doctors
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0891
Title
Courts - Service of Process - Driver of Motor Vehicle or Driver's Estate
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0244 /CH0089 Correctional Services - Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services - Subpoena Power Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 89
Judiciary
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0346 /CH0031 (SB0216/CH0030) Harford County - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights Harford County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 31
Appropriations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0474 (SB0611) Health Occupations - Maryland Behavior Analysts Act Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0570 State Government - Inspector General Delegate Miller, W. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0806 /CH0391 Health Occupations - State Board of Social Work Examiners - Revisions Delegate Hubbard 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 391
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1029 (SB0783) State Board of Physicians - Naturopathic Doctors Delegate Oaks 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1096 /CH0401 (SB0672) State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation Delegate Hammen 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 401
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1255 Motor Vehicles - Towing Services - Licensing Delegate Niemann 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1257 /CH0674 Land Use - Clarifications and Corrections Delegate McIntosh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 674
Environmental Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1481 (SB0557/CH0287) Medical Records - Disclosure in Response to Compulsory Process Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Health and Government Operations
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0169 Criminal Procedure - Reports to Crimesolvers/Crimestoppers Organization - Inadmissibility and Confidentiality Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2013 - 2:00 PM
SB0216 /CH0030 (HB0346/CH0031) Harford County - Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights Senator Glassman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 30
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2013 - 2:00 PM
Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0557 /CH0287 (HB1481) Medical Records - Disclosure in Response to Compulsory Process Senator Stone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 287
Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0611 (HB0474) Health Occupations - Maryland Behavior Analysts Act Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0672 (HB1096/CH0401) State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation Senator Conway 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0783 (HB1029) State Board of Physicians - Naturopathic Doctors Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0891 Courts - Service of Process - Driver of Motor Vehicle or Driver's Estate Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM