Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Subpoenas

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0446 /CH0178 (SB0909/CH0177)
Title
Charles County - Collective Bargaining for Public Safety Officials
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0693 (SB0642)
Title
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Investigations and Subpoenas - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1113 (SB0988)
Title
Health Occupations - Maryland Community Health Worker Act
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1526 /CH0622 (SB0934)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Postsentencing - Victim Notification
Sponsor
Delegate Angel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0642 (HB0693)
Title
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Investigations and Subpoenas - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0909 /CH0177 (HB0446/CH0178)
Title
Charles County - Collective Bargaining for Public Safety Officials
Sponsor
Charles County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0934 (HB1526/CH0622)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Postsentencing - Victim Notification
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0988 (HB1113)
Title
Health Occupations - Maryland Community Health Worker Act
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0446 /CH0178 (SB0909/CH0177) Charles County - Collective Bargaining for Public Safety Officials Charles County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 178
Appropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0693 (SB0642) State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Investigations and Subpoenas - Revisions Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1113 (SB0988) Health Occupations - Maryland Community Health Worker Act Delegate Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway)
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1526 /CH0622 (SB0934) Criminal Procedure - Postsentencing - Victim Notification Delegate Angel 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 622
Judiciary
3/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0642 (HB0693) State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Investigations and Subpoenas - Revisions Senator Bates 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0909 /CH0177 (HB0446/CH0178) Charles County - Collective Bargaining for Public Safety Officials Charles County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 177
Finance
3/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0934 (HB1526/CH0622) Criminal Procedure - Postsentencing - Victim Notification Senator Smith 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0988 (HB1113) Health Occupations - Maryland Community Health Worker Act Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:52 PM