Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Support of Dependents -see also- Alimony

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0001 /CH0004 (SB0002/CH0003)
Title
Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0386
Title
Child Support - Potential Income - Definition
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0629 (SB0568)
Title
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Retiree Dependent Participation in the Maryland Rx Program
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0804
Title
Child Support Administration - Suspension of Driver's License or Privilege to Drive for Arrears - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1032 (SB0684)
Title
Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting Time
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1034
Title
Grounds for Divorce - Mutual Consent - Military Service Member
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1152 (SB0965)
Title
Family Law - Age of Majority - Jurisdiction of Court
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1211
Title
Maryland Uniform Interstate Family Support Act - Modification of Orders
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1293
Title
Family Law - Child Support Guidelines - Actual Income and Attorney's Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Metzgar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1554 /CH0406
Title
Child Support - Payment Incentive Program Expansion Act of 2018
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1723 /CH0625
Title
Charles County - Work Release - Collection of Inmate Earnings
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1757 (SB1124)
Title
Garrett County – Pretrial Release, Work Release, and Home Detention Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0002 /CH0003 (HB0001/CH0004)
Title
Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0061 /CH0412
Title
Child Support - Noncustodial Parent Employment Assistance Pilot Program - Documentation and Reporting
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0079 /CH0413
Title
Child Support - Employment Program Participation - Reinstatement of Driver's License and Expungement of Suspension
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0097 /CH0051
Title
Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services - Disclosure of Records
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0120 /CH0850
Title
Family Law - Divorce on Grounds of Mutual Consent - Parties With Minor Children
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0187 /CH0010 (HB0161)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2018
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0568 (HB0629)
Title
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Retiree Dependent Participation in the Maryland Rx Program
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0684 (HB1032)
Title
Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting Time
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0965 (HB1152)
Title
Family Law - Age of Majority - Jurisdiction of Court
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1124 (HB1757)
Title
Garrett County – Pretrial Release, Work Release, and Home Detention Programs
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1187
Title
Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Child Support
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0001 /CH0004 (SB0002/CH0003) Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act) Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 4
Judiciary
1/18/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0386 Child Support - Potential Income - Definition Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0629 (SB0568) State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Retiree Dependent Participation in the Maryland Rx Program Delegate Krimm 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0804 Child Support Administration - Suspension of Driver's License or Privilege to Drive for Arrears - Exemption Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1032 (SB0684) Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting Time Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1034 Grounds for Divorce - Mutual Consent - Military Service Member Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1152 (SB0965) Family Law - Age of Majority - Jurisdiction of Court Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1211 Maryland Uniform Interstate Family Support Act - Modification of Orders Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB1293 Family Law - Child Support Guidelines - Actual Income and Attorney's Fees Delegate Metzgar 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1554 /CH0406 Child Support - Payment Incentive Program Expansion Act of 2018 Delegate Lewis, J. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 406
Judiciary
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1723 /CH0625 Charles County - Work Release - Collection of Inmate Earnings Charles County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 625
Judiciary
3/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1757 (SB1124) Garrett County – Pretrial Release, Work Release, and Home Detention Programs Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0002 /CH0003 (HB0001/CH0004) Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act) Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 3
Judicial Proceedings
1/11/2018 - 1:15 PM
Judiciary
SB0061 /CH0412 Child Support - Noncustodial Parent Employment Assistance Pilot Program - Documentation and Reporting Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 412
Judicial Proceedings
1/18/2018 - 3:00 PM
Judiciary
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0079 /CH0413 Child Support - Employment Program Participation - Reinstatement of Driver's License and Expungement of Suspension Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 413
Judicial Proceedings
1/18/2018 - 3:00 PM
Judiciary
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0097 /CH0051 Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services - Disclosure of Records Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 51
Finance
1/16/2018 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
3/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0120 /CH0850 Family Law - Divorce on Grounds of Mutual Consent - Parties With Minor Children Senator Zirkin 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 850
Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0187 /CH0010 (HB0161) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2018 President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 10
Budget and Taxation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0568 (HB0629) State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Retiree Dependent Participation in the Maryland Rx Program Senator McFadden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 8:30 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/22/2018 - 8:30 AM
SB0684 (HB1032) Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting Time Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0965 (HB1152) Family Law - Age of Majority - Jurisdiction of Court Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1124 (HB1757) Garrett County – Pretrial Release, Work Release, and Home Detention Programs Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1187 Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Child Support Senator Bates 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:56 PM